EP1059173 - Ink jet recording media having a coating comprising alumina particulate and film laminates thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARKWRIGHT Incorporated 538 Main Street, P.O. Box 139 Fiskeville Rhode Island 02823-0139 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | For all designated states ARKWRIGHT Incorporated 538 Main Street, P.O. Box 139 Fiskeville, Rhode Island 02823-0139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wang, Yongzhong 6 Crestwood Lane Lincoln, Rhode Island 02865 / US | 02 /
Rahim, Caridad H. 321 West Squire Drive Rochester, New York 14623 / US | [2001/04] |
Former [2000/50] | 01 /
Wang, Yongzhong 31 Old Carriage way West Warwick, Rhode Island 02893 / US | ||
02 /
Rahim, Caridad H. 321 West Squire Drive Rochester, New York 14623 / US | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00112244.9 | 07.06.2000 | [2000/50] | Priority number, date | US19990330193 | 11.06.1999 Original published format: US 330193 | [2000/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1059173 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1059173 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | [2001/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/00, B41M7/00 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
B41M5/506 (EP,US);
B41M5/52 (EP,US);
B41M7/0027 (EP,US);
B41M5/508 (EP,US);
B41M5/5218 (EP,US);
B41M5/5227 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2001/48] |
Former [2000/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Aluminiumoxidteilchen enthaltende Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsmedien und Filmlaminate davon | [2000/50] | English: | Ink jet recording media having a coating comprising alumina particulate and film laminates thereof | [2000/50] | French: | Milieux d'enregistrement par jet d'encre contenant des particules d'alumine et films stratifiés contenant ces milieux | [2000/50] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/26] | 17.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.10.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 24.10.2001 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0705710 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-21 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 3 * * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 31 * * examples 1,2,4 *; | [Y]US4910084 (YAMASAKI TAKESHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-21 * column 3, line 13 - column 3, line 57; examples 6,7,13-18 *; | [A]EP0881092 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 20,21 * example - * * page 2, line 50 - page 3, line 1 * * page 6, line 15 - line 26 *; | [A]EP0900667 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 55 - page 4, line 28 * * example - *; | [A]EP0627324 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 11 - page 4, line 11 * * page 5, line 15 - line 55 * * examples 1,2,4,5 * |