EP1060989 - Automatic machine for the preparation of half-packages starting from corresponding blanks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2005 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states H.P.F. S.r.l. Via del Savena 18, Frazione Pian di Macina 40065 Pianoro (BO) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | For all designated states H.P.F. S.r.l. Via del Savena 18, Frazione Pian di Macina 40065 Pianoro (BO) / IT | ||
Former [2000/51] | For all designated states MG2 S.p.A. Via del Savena, 18 40065 Pian di Macina (Pianoro) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gamberini, Ernesto Via Valleverde 43/2 40067 Rastignano / IT | [2000/52] | Representative(s) | Cerbaro, Elena, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/51] | Cerbaro, Elena, Dr., et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 00112590.5 | 14.06.2000 | [2000/51] | Priority number, date | IT1999BO00323 | 15.06.1999 Original published format: IT BO990323 | [2000/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1060989 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1060989 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65B19/24, B65B43/10, B65B5/02 | [2000/51] | CPC: |
B65B19/245 (EP,US);
B65B43/10 (EP,US);
B65B5/024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI [2001/36] |
Former [2000/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HALBPACKUNGEN, AUSGEHEND VON ENTSPRECHENDEN ZUSCHNITTEN | [2000/51] | English: | Automatic machine for the preparation of half-packages starting from corresponding blanks | [2000/51] | French: | Machine automatique pour la fabrication de demi-emballages à partir d'ébauches correspondantes | [2000/51] | Examination procedure | 12.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/34] | 18.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 31.03.2004 | FR | 31.03.2004 | CH | 30.06.2004 | GB | 30.06.2004 | LI | 30.06.2004 | DE | 01.01.2005 | [2007/08] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 31.03.2004 | |
CH | 30.06.2004 | ||
GB | 30.06.2004 | ||
LI | 30.06.2004 | ||
DE | 01.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | CH | 30.06.2004 | |
GB | 30.06.2004 | ||
LI | 30.06.2004 | ||
DE | 01.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/30] | CH | 30.06.2004 | |
LI | 30.06.2004 | ||
DE | 01.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 30.06.2004 | |
LI | 30.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3461642 (LANGEN JACOBUS JOSEPH, et al) [A] 1* column 4, line 71 - column 6, line 55; figure - *; | [A]FR2259014 (AMF INC [US]) [A] 2,16-19,23 * page 11, line 1 - page 13, line 16; figure - *; | [A]EP0286846 (SCHMERMUND MASCHF ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1,3,5-7,9,10,16-19,23 * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 25; figure - * | Examination | EP0906865 | by applicant | ITBO970593 |