Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002019744 | Global Dossier | 23.01.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | EP00112591 | 14.06.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1163997 | Global Dossier | 25.08.2004 | B1 | EP1163997 | 19.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP00112591 | 14.06.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE274411T | 15.09.2004 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP00112591 | 14.06.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60013262D1 | 30.09.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP00112591 | 14.06.2000 |