EP1163997 - Method and unit for heating tear-off zones of a strip of packaging material for producing sealed packages of pourable food products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance SA Avenue Général-Guisan 70 1009 Pully / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance SA Avenue Général-Guisan 70, P.O. Box 430 1009 Pully / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Larsson, Bernt Notarievägen, 15 237 31 Bjärred / SE | 02 /
Jönsson, Roger Klamby 26:1 270 33 Vollsjö / SE | [2004/09] |
Former [2001/51] | 01 /
Larsson, Bernt Notarievägen, 15 237 31 Bjärred / SE | ||
02 /
Jönsson, Roger Klamby 26 270 33 Vollsjö / SE | Representative(s) | Franzolin, Luigi, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | Franzolin, Luigi, et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 00112591.3 | 14.06.2000 | [2001/51] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1163997 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1163997 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B29C59/00, B65H23/188 | [2001/51] | CPC: |
B29C59/007 (EP);
B65H37/04 (EP);
B29C2035/0811 (EP);
B29C71/0063 (EP);
B29L2009/00 (EP);
B29L2031/712 (EP);
B65H2301/5143 (EP);
B65H2511/512 (EP);
B65H2513/10 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/512, B65H2220/01 (EP);
B65H2513/10, B65H2220/01 (EP);
B65H2513/50, B65H2220/02 (EP);
B65H2515/40, B65H2220/02 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/40] |
Former [2002/37] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2001/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Aufheizen eines Aufreissstreifens von Verpackungsfolienmaterial zur Herstellung von versiegelten Verpackungen fliessfähiger Nahrungsmittel | [2004/05] | English: | Method and unit for heating tear-off zones of a strip of packaging material for producing sealed packages of pourable food products | [2001/51] | French: | Methode et dispositif pour chauffer la zone de dechirage d'une bande de materiau d'emballage pour la production d'emballages scelles de produits alimentaires liquides | [2001/51] |
Former [2001/51] | Verfahren und vorrichtung zum aufheizen eines Aufreissstreifens von Verpackungs folienmaterial zur herstellung von versiegelten Verpackungen fliessfähiger Nahrungsmittel | Examination procedure | 10.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/40] | 07.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.08.2004 | BE | 25.08.2004 | CH | 25.08.2004 | FI | 25.08.2004 | FR | 25.08.2004 | LI | 25.08.2004 | NL | 25.08.2004 | DK | 25.11.2004 | GR | 25.11.2004 | SE | 25.11.2004 | DE | 26.11.2004 | ES | 06.12.2004 | PT | 25.01.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2006/32] | AT | 25.08.2004 | |
BE | 25.08.2004 | ||
CH | 25.08.2004 | ||
FI | 25.08.2004 | ||
FR | 25.08.2004 | ||
LI | 25.08.2004 | ||
NL | 25.08.2004 | ||
DK | 25.11.2004 | ||
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
DE | 26.11.2004 | ||
ES | 06.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 25.08.2004 | |
BE | 25.08.2004 | ||
CH | 25.08.2004 | ||
FI | 25.08.2004 | ||
LI | 25.08.2004 | ||
NL | 25.08.2004 | ||
DK | 25.11.2004 | ||
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
DE | 26.11.2004 | ||
ES | 06.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/03] | AT | 25.08.2004 | |
BE | 25.08.2004 | ||
CH | 25.08.2004 | ||
FI | 25.08.2004 | ||
LI | 25.08.2004 | ||
DK | 25.11.2004 | ||
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
DE | 26.11.2004 | ||
ES | 06.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 25.08.2004 | |
BE | 25.08.2004 | ||
CH | 25.08.2004 | ||
FI | 25.08.2004 | ||
LI | 25.08.2004 | ||
DK | 25.11.2004 | ||
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
ES | 06.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 25.08.2004 | |
CH | 25.08.2004 | ||
FI | 25.08.2004 | ||
LI | 25.08.2004 | ||
DK | 25.11.2004 | ||
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
ES | 06.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 25.08.2004 | |
CH | 25.08.2004 | ||
FI | 25.08.2004 | ||
LI | 25.08.2004 | ||
DK | 25.11.2004 | ||
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 25.08.2004 | |
CH | 25.08.2004 | ||
FI | 25.08.2004 | ||
LI | 25.08.2004 | ||
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 25.08.2004 | |
FI | 25.08.2004 | ||
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 25.08.2004 | |
FI | 25.08.2004 | ||
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 25.08.2004 | |
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 25.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3909582 (BOWEN WILLIAM EDMUND) [A] 1,7 * column 1, line 61 - line 18 * * column 4, line 64 - line 11 * * column 6, line 39 - column 7, line 7 * * column 14, line 42 - column 15, line 64 *; | [A]US4265616 (HETHERINGTON BRIAN L) [A] 1,7 * column 1, line 49 - line 21 * * column 3, line 26 - line 49 *; | [A]GB2088340 (HAUNI WERKE KOERBER & CO KG) [A] 2-5,8-12* page 1, line 114 - page 2, line 102 *; | [A]US5000321 (HEILMANN WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [A] 1,7 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 29 *; | [Y]US5470300 (TERRANOVA PETER [US]) [Y] 1-16 * column 1, line 19 - line 58 * * column 3, line 8 - column 5, line 38 *; | [Y]WO9814317 (ELOPAK SYSTEMS [CH], et al) [Y] 1-16 * page 2, line 24 - page 4, line 33 * * page 6, line 31 - page 7, line 16; figures 2,6,11 * |