EP1041432 - A silver halide light-sensitive photographic emulsion, a silver halide light-sensitive photographic material and a method of processing thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.04.2004 [2004/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/40] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamashita, Kiyotoshi c/o Konica Corporation, 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo 160 / JP | 02 /
Nishiwaki, Shu c/o Konica Corporation, 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo 160 / JP | 03 /
Honda, Yasuo c/o Konica Corporation, 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo 160 / JP | [2000/40] | Representative(s) | Rees, Alexander Ellison, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 30 Welbeck Street London WC1G 8ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/40] | Rees, Alexander Ellison, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 30 Welbeck Street London W1M 7PG / GB | Application number, filing date | 00112764.6 | 09.03.1994 | [2000/40] | Priority number, date | JP19930049441 | 10.03.1993 Original published format: JP 4944193 | [2000/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1041432 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/005 | [2000/40] | CPC: |
G03C1/0051 (EP,US);
G03C2001/0055 (EP,US);
G03C2001/0058 (EP,US);
G03C2001/03511 (EP,US);
G03C2001/03535 (EP,US);
G03C2001/03558 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/40] | Title | German: | Photographische lichtempfindliche Silberhalogenidemulsion, photographisches lichtempfindliches Silberhalogenidmaterial und Verfahren zu deren Verarbeitung | [2000/40] | English: | A silver halide light-sensitive photographic emulsion, a silver halide light-sensitive photographic material and a method of processing thereof | [2000/40] | French: | Emulsion photographique à l'halogénure d'argent sensible à la lumière,matériau photographique à l'halogénure d'argent sensible à la lumière et méthode de traitement de celui-ci | [2000/40] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/21] | 01.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/15] | 04.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/15] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94301653.5 / EP0615157 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0416881 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [Y] 5 * page 2, line 52 - page 3, line 4 * * page 3, line 30 - line 36 ** page 7; table 1 *; | [Y]US5068173 (TAKEHARA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-11 * column 3, line 36 - line 43 * * column 4, line 30 - line 37 * * column 4, line 63 - line 68 * * column 5, line 33 - line 45 * * column 5, line 61 - column 6, line 12 * * column 9, line 51 - line 56 * * column 27; table 5 *; | [DY]EP0515894 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [DY] 1-11 * page 6, line 5 - line 32; claims 1-4,9 * |