EP1164161 - Thermoplastic hydrophilic polymeric compositions with high water solubility component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Corzani, Italo Via Fontevecchia, 40 66100 Chieti / IT | 02 /
Russo, Elisabetta Via Valentino Mazzola, 38 00142 Rom / IT | 03 /
Sirianni, Giuseppe S. Maria alle Fornaci 8/7 00165 Rom / IT | [2001/51] | Representative(s) | Veronese, Pancrazio, et al Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65823 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Veronese, Pancrazio, et al Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65823 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2001/51] | Veronese, Pancrazio, et al Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 00112769.5 | 16.06.2000 | [2001/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1164161 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/134, A61L15/22 | [2001/51] | CPC: |
A61L15/42 (EP);
A61F13/51462 (EP);
A61L15/225 (EP);
C08K5/0016 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/37] |
Former [2001/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Thermoplastische, hydrophile Polymerzusammensetzung mit einem Weichmacher geringer Wasserlöslichkeit | [2001/51] | English: | Thermoplastic hydrophilic polymeric compositions with high water solubility component | [2001/51] | French: | Composition polymère hydrophile avec un plastifiant de solubilité a l'eau ammelioré | [2001/51] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/17] | 19.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.08.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.08.2002 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]WO9964077 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [XD] 1-9 * claims 1-8 *; | [XD]WO9964505 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [XD] 1-9 * claims 1-10 *; | [X]EP0601463 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-6 * page 3, line 17 - page 3, line 27 * * page 6, line 32 - page 6, line 47 * * examples 13-18 *; | [X]EP0844006 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP]) [X] 1,4,5 * page 1, line 15 - page 19, line 45 * * claims 1,6,12 *; | [X]JPH03193057 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1991, no. 40, Database accession no. 1991-291354, XP002150519 & JPH03193057 A 19910822 (NIPPON SEIKA KK) [X] 1,3 * abstract * |