EP1065040 - Apparatus for in line deep-drawing of cup shaped containers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.08.2003 [2003/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maier Packaging GmbH Bahnhofstrasse 110 83224 Grassau / DE | [2001/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herr Stefan Maier Staudacher strasse 42 83250 Marquartstein / DE | [2001/01] | Representative(s) | Busse & Busse Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 12 26 49002 Osnabrück / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | Busse & Busse Patentanwälte Postfach 12 26 49002 Osnabrück / DE | Application number, filing date | 00112852.9 | 17.06.2000 | [2001/01] | Priority number, date | DE19992011272U | 30.06.1999 Original published format: DE 29911272 U | [2001/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1065040 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1065040 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | [2003/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B29C51/16 | [2001/01] | CPC: |
B29C51/167 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Maschine zum reihenweisen Tiefziehen von becherförmigen Behältern | [2001/01] | English: | Apparatus for in line deep-drawing of cup shaped containers | [2001/01] | French: | Dispositif pour l'emboutissage en ligne de récipients en forme de gobelets | [2001/01] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]GB2322093 (ERCA [FR]) [Y] 1-4 * figures 4,5; claim 1 * [A] 6-10; | [Y]EP0296302 (BEMAC SRL [IT]) [Y] 1-4 * column 5, line 29; figures 1,4,5 *; | [YA]US4591327 (HAUTEMONT JEAN-CLAUDE [FR]) [Y] 1,2 * figures 1-22; claim 20 * [A] 6-13; | [A]US4734026 (HAUTEMONT JEAN-CLAUDE [FR]) [A] 1-13 * figures 1-17; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0595680 (HASSIA VERPACKUNG AG [DE]) [A] 1-5 * figures 1-15; claim 1 *; | [A]FR2528349 (ERCA HOLDING [FR]) [A] 6-13 * figures 1-4; claims 1-7 *; | [A]EP0368185 (HASSIA VERPACKUNG AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1-4; claims 1-5 *; | [A]US5591463 (PADOVANI PIETRO DR [IT]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 10 - line 20; claim 1 *; | [A]DE19535033 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1-8; claim 1 * |