EP1168739 - Method and apparatus for estimating the impulse response of a transmission channel, in particular for a cellular mobile telephone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics N.V. Tower B, 17th Floor, World Trade Center, Strawinskylaan 1725 1077 XX Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics N.V. Tower B, 17th Floor, World Trade Center, Strawinskylaan 1725 1077 XX Amsterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chappaz, David 19, rue Amat 1202 Genève / CH | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | Casalonga, Axel BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00113060.8 | 23.06.2000 | [2002/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1168739 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1168739 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/02 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
H04L25/0202 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/38] |
Former [2002/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Schätzung der Impulsantwort eines Übertragungskanals, insbesondere für ein zellulares Mobiltelefon | [2002/01] | English: | Method and apparatus for estimating the impulse response of a transmission channel, in particular for a cellular mobile telephone | [2002/01] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'estimation de la réponse impulsionelle d'un canal de transmission d'informations, en particulier pour un téléphone mobile cellulaire | [2002/01] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/35] | 21.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 19.10.2005 | DE | 20.01.2006 | [2007/35] |
Former [2006/51] | DE | 20.01.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5889827 (BOTTOMLEY GREGORY E [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 4, line 49 - line 67 *; | [A]WO9840977 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 23 - page 3, line 8 *; | [A]WO9744916 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 2 - line 12 * |