Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1063261
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
25.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
04.06.2004 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 21.07.2004 [2004/30] |
10.01.2004 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
15.07.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.07.2003 |
Deletion: Reply to examination report |
|
10.07.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.05.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
22.11.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
16.10.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
23.08.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
13.07.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
24.06.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
21.03.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
25.01.2002 |
First examination report |
|
21.01.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
23.11.2001 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 09.01.2002 [2002/02] |
28.07.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.09.2001 [2001/37] |
02.03.2001 |
Publication of search report |
published on 18.04.2001 [2001/16] |
10.11.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.12.2000 [2000/52] |