EP1063261 - Sulfur-vulcanized rubber composition for making laminate and laminate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.06.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541-8550 / JP | For all designated states TOYODA GOSEI CO., LTD. 1, Aza-nagahata, Ohaza-ochiai, Kasuga-cho Nishikasugai-gun Aichi 452-8564 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541-8550 / JP | ||
For all designated states Toyoda Gosei Co., Ltd. 1, Aza-nagahata, Ohaza-ochiai, Kasuga-cho Nishikasugai-gun, Aichi 452-8564 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wadaki, Takeru 45-101, Daijuku Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0241 / JP | 02 /
Okita, Tomoaki 2-130, Jojo-cho Kasugai-shi, Aichi 486-0833 / JP | 03 /
Nakashima, Katsumi 269-4, Aza-kitadote, Ohaza-komyoji Ichinomiya-shi, Aichi 491-0135 / JP | [2000/52] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/52] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00113084.8 | 26.06.2000 | [2000/52] | Priority number, date | JP19990178266 | 24.06.1999 Original published format: JP 17826699 | [2000/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1063261 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1063261 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | [2001/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/16, C08K3/26, C08K3/22 | [2000/52] | CPC: |
C08L23/16 (EP);
C08L23/02 (EP);
C08L91/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/16, C08L2666/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2002/02] |
Former [2000/52] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schwefelvulkanisierte Gummimischung für Schichtstoffe und daraus hergestellte Schichtstoffe | [2000/52] | English: | Sulfur-vulcanized rubber composition for making laminate and laminate | [2000/52] | French: | Composition de caoutchouc vulcanisé pour la fabrication des stratifiés et stratifiés à partir de celle-ci. | [2000/52] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/37] | 24.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 02.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/30] | 16.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH09255818 ; | [X]JPH06246849 ; | [X]JPS5324349 ; | [A]JPS5464544 ; | [XY]US5691406 (LANE JOSEPH A [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 8 * [Y] 4,5; | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1997-532872, XP002147716 & JPH09255818 A 19970930 (SUMITOMO) [X] 1-5 * abstract * [Y] 4,5 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1994-321783, XP002147717 & JPH06246849 A 19940906 (NISHIKAWA) [X] 1-5 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1978-49416a, XP002147718 & JPS5324349 A 19780307 (MISUI) [X] 1-5 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1979-49760b, XP002147719 & JPS5464544 A 19790524 (KYOWA) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | Examination | - DSM Elastomers, Survey of processing oils |