EP1064864 - Molded surface fastener, and molding apparatus and molding method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.06.2006 [2006/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YKK Corporation No. 1, Kanda Izumi-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | For all designated states YKK CORPORATION No. 1, Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takizawa, Toshiaki 235-2, Oka Kurobe-shi, Toyama-ken / JP | 02 /
Murasaki, Ryuichi 222-6, Urada, Tateyama-machi Nakaniikawa-gun, Toyama-ken / JP | [2001/01] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00113091.3 | 27.06.2000 | [2001/01] | Priority number, date | JP19990181800 | 28.06.1999 Original published format: JP 18180099 | JP19990268243 | 22.09.1999 Original published format: JP 26824399 | [2001/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1064864 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1064864 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | [2002/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A44B18/00 | [2001/01] | CPC: |
A44B18/0084 (EP,US);
A44B18/00 (KR);
A44B18/0049 (EP,US);
Y10T24/2775 (EP,US);
Y10T24/2792 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2003/29] |
Former [2001/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gegossener Flächenhaftverschluss sowie Verfahren und Vorrichtung zu dessen Herstellung | [2001/01] | English: | Molded surface fastener, and molding apparatus and molding method therefor | [2001/01] | French: | Fermeture à éléments d'accrochage réalisée par moulage, procédé et dispositif pour sa fabrication | [2001/01] | Examination procedure | 14.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/12] | 24.04.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 29.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/25] | 08.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.05.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.05.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.05.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.05.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.05.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.05.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.05.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.05.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.05.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.05.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.05.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.05.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.05.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0324577 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [A]US5345659 (ALLAN ROBERT M [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0811331 (YKK CORP [JP]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [PAD]EP0931472 (YKK CORP [JP]) [PAD] 1-16 * figure 2; claims 1,7,8,12 * |