Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3344371B | Global Dossier | 11.11.2002 | B2 | JP2001012229 | 16.01.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | JP17701199 | 23.06.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1064984 | Global Dossier | 10.09.2008 | B1 | EP1064984 | 31.10.2001 | A3 | EP1064984 | 03.01.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP17701199 | 23.06.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60040187D1 | 23.10.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP17701199 | 23.06.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6361579 | 26.03.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP17701199 | 23.06.1999 |