EP1064984 - Method for purifying internal combustion engine exhaust gas [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/01] | Exhaust gas purifier and method for purifying internal combustion engine exhaust gas | ||
[2007/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2008/37] |
Former [2001/01] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Itoh, Kazuhiro c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Toshiaki c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | [2009/01] |
Former [2001/01] | 01 /
Itoh, Kazuhiko c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | ||
02 /
Tanaka, Toshiaki c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/01] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00113245.5 | 21.06.2000 | [2001/01] | Priority number, date | JP19990177011 | 23.06.1999 Original published format: JP 17701199 | [2001/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1064984 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1064984 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | [2001/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1064984 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/94, F01N3/02, F01N3/022, F01N3/08 | [2001/44] | CPC: |
F01N3/085 (EP,US);
B01D53/92 (EP,US);
F01N13/009 (EP,US);
F01N3/022 (EP,US);
F01N3/023 (EP,US);
F01N3/033 (EP,US);
F01N3/035 (EP,US);
F01N3/0821 (EP,US);
F01N2250/02 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/01] | B01D53/94, F01N3/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/29] |
Former [2001/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Reinigen von Brennkraftmaschineabgas | [2007/44] | English: | Method for purifying internal combustion engine exhaust gas | [2007/44] | French: | Méthode pour purifier le gaz d'échappement d'un moteur à combustion interne | [2007/44] |
Former [2001/01] | Abgasreiniger und Verfahren zum Reinigen von Brennkraftmaschineabgas | ||
Former [2001/01] | Exhaust gas purifier and method for purifying internal combustion engine exhaust gas | ||
Former [2001/01] | Purificateur de gaz d'échappement et méthode pour purifier le gaz d'échappement d'un moteur à combustion interne | Examination procedure | 21.06.2000 | Examination requested [2001/01] | 23.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.10.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 18.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/34] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 18.07.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH02261511 ; | [X]JPH06272541 ; | [X]JPH06159037 ; | [X]US3966443 (OKANO RYOICHI, et al) [X] 1-4 * column 3, line 50 - line 67; figure -; claim - *; | [X]EP0105113 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [X] 1-4 * figure -; example -; claim - *; | [X]EP0154145 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [X] 1-4 * figure 1; claim - *; | [X]EP0341832 (JOHNSON MATTHEY INC [US]) [X] 1-4 * page 2, line 52 - page 4, line 9; figure -; claim - *; | [X]FR2650628 (ARIS SA [FR]) [X] 1-4 * page 12, line 8 - line 28; figure -; claim - * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910110), vol. 015, no. 012, Database accession no. (C - 0795), & JP02261511 A 19901024 (KOMATSU LTD) [X] 1-4 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941226), vol. 018, no. 691, Database accession no. (M - 1731), & JP06272541 A 19940927 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1-4 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940913), vol. 018, no. 491, Database accession no. (M - 1672), & JP06159037 A 19940607 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1-4 * abstract * | Examination | WO9320937 |