blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1080998

EP1080998 - Method of making a hidden tear seam in a vehicle body panel [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.04.2005
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 16.07.2008  [2008/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION
300 Renaissance Center Detroit
Michigan 48265-3000 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/10]For all designated states
General Motors Corporation
300 Renaissance Center
Detroit, Michigan 48265-3000 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Barnes, William Joseph
2920 Garfield
Waterford, MI 48329 / US
 [2001/10]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/29]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
Former [2001/10]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner
Postfach 22 16 11
80506 München / DE
Application number, filing date00113250.521.06.2000
[2001/10]
Priority number, dateUS1999038343127.08.1999         Original published format: US 383431
[2001/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1080998
Date:07.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1080998
Date:14.03.2001
[2001/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.01.2001
ClassificationIPC:B60R21/20, B29C37/00
[2001/10]
CPC:
B60R21/2165 (EP,US); B29C37/0057 (EP,US); B29C41/36 (EP,US);
B29K2075/00 (EP,US); B29L2031/3008 (EP,US); B60R21/205 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/49]
Former [2001/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung einer versteckten Reissnaht in einer Fahrzeugkarosserieverkleidung[2001/10]
English:Method of making a hidden tear seam in a vehicle body panel[2001/10]
French:Procédé de fabrication un ligne de rupture dissimulees dans un panneaux de carrosserie de véhicule[2001/10]
Examination procedure27.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/32]
01.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/24]
13.01.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2005/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200405   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5447328  (IANNAZZI PETER J [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 49 - column 4, line 5; figures 1-3,6-8 * [Y] 3;
 [Y]US4610620  (GRAY JOHN D [US]) [Y] 3 * column 4, lines 34-44; figures 1,2,7 *;
 [A]EP0893224  (BENECKE KALIKO AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5443777  (MILLS DANIEL H [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, lines 27-46 * * column 6, line 41 - column 7, line 14; figure 7 *;
 [A]US5431434  (YAMAKAWA KAZUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5590903  (PHILLION JACK A [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 6, lines 46-60; figures 3,7 *;
 [A]US5804121  (GALLAGHER MICHAEL J [US]) [A] 3 * column 3, lines 57-60 * * column 7, lines 20-39; figures 2,7 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.