Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.03.2003 | Refusal of application | published on 23.04.2003 [2003/17] |
20.11.2002 | Application refused | |
30.07.2002 | Surcharge for renewal fee | |
31.05.2002 | First examination report | |
27.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant | |
06.12.2001 | Change - extension states | |
03.08.2001 | Definitive list of designations | published on 19.09.2001 [2001/38] |
17.11.2000 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.01.2001 [2001/01] |
17.11.2000 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.01.2001 [2001/01] |