EP1167303 - Method for reducing sludge resulting from the cleaning of waste water in a biological oxidation step of a purification plant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 24.01.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kalos, Georg Am Glockenstein 10B 27777 Ganderkesee / DE | For all designated states Schäfer, Joachim Paul Fohlenweg 5 40885 Ratingen / DE | For all designated states Kalogeropoulos, George Miclias Str. 6 Nea Philadelphia Athen / GR | [2014/09] |
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states Kalos, Georg Am Glockenstein 10B 27777 Ganderkesee / DE | ||
For all designated states Schäfer, Joachim Paul Fohlenweg 5 40885 Ratingen / DE | |||
For all designated states Kalogeropoulos, George Miclias Str. 6 Nea Philadelphia Athen / GR | |||
Former [2004/05] | For all designated states Kalos, Georg Am Glockenstein 10B 27777 Ganderkesee / DE | ||
For all designated states Schäfer, Joachim Paul Fohlenweg 5 40885 Ratingen / DE | |||
For all designated states Kalogeropoulos, George Miclias Str. 6 Nea Philadelphia Athen / GR | |||
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states WWE Wastewater Engineering Limited Greenwood House, 8 Salisbury Court London EC4 Y8AA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kalos, Georg Am Glockenstein 10 B 27777 Ganderkesee / DE | 02 /
Schäfer, Joachim Paul Fohlenweg 5 40885 Ratingen / DE | 03 /
Kalogeropoulos, George Miclias St. 6 Nea Philadelphia, Athen / GR | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Weigel, Matthias, et al Weigel, Wyrwoll & Kollegen Frauenlobstrasse 2 80337 München / DE | [2014/09] |
Former [2010/23] | Weigel, Matthias, et al Weigel, Wyrwoll & Kollegen Frauenlobstrasse 2 80337 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/01] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 00113477.4 | 26.06.2000 | [2002/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1167303 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1167303 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/09] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1167303 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/12, C02F11/02 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
C02F3/1221 (EP);
C02F2101/301 (EP);
C02F2305/06 (EP);
Y02W10/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reduzierung von bei der Reinigung von Abwasser in einer biologischen Oxidationsstufe einer Kläranlage anfallendem Überschuss-Klärschlamm | [2002/01] | English: | Method for reducing sludge resulting from the cleaning of waste water in a biological oxidation step of a purification plant | [2002/01] | French: | Procédé de rédution de boues provenant du traitement d'eaux résiduaires dans une étape d'oxidation biologique d' une station d'épuration | [2002/01] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/32] | 23.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.11.2009
ADMISSIBLE BIOSERVE Carl-Zeiss-Str. 53 55129 Mainz / DE Opponent's representative Bohmann, Armin K., et al, et al Bohmann Anwaltssozietät Nymphenburger Straße 1 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.11.2009
ADMISSIBLE BIOSERVE Carl-Zeiss-Str. 53 55129 Mainz / DE Opponent's representative Bohmann, Armin K., et al, et al Bohmann Anwaltssozietät Nymphenburger Strasse 1 80335 München / DE | 11.01.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.07.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.02.2013 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.02.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.04.2013 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.04.2013 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 02.01.2014 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 21.06.2013 | Appeal received No. T1428/13 | 21.08.2013 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.12.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 25.02.2009 | DK | 25.02.2009 | FI | 25.02.2009 | IE | 25.02.2009 | IT | 25.02.2009 | NL | 25.02.2009 | SE | 25.05.2009 | ES | 05.06.2009 | AT | 26.06.2009 | GB | 26.06.2009 | LU | 26.06.2009 | BE | 30.06.2009 | CH | 30.06.2009 | FR | 30.06.2009 | LI | 30.06.2009 | MC | 30.06.2009 | PT | 12.08.2009 | [2015/21] |
Former [2011/21] | DK | 25.02.2009 | |
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
IT | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
AT | 26.06.2009 | ||
GB | 26.06.2009 | ||
LU | 26.06.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
FR | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | DK | 25.02.2009 | |
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
IT | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
AT | 26.06.2009 | ||
GB | 26.06.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
FR | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/37] | DK | 25.02.2009 | |
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
AT | 26.06.2009 | ||
GB | 26.06.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
FR | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | DK | 25.02.2009 | |
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
GB | 26.06.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
FR | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | DK | 25.02.2009 | |
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
GB | 26.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
FR | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | DK | 25.02.2009 | |
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
FR | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | DK | 25.02.2009 | |
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | DK | 25.02.2009 | |
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | DK | 25.02.2009 | |
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | DK | 25.02.2009 | |
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | DK | 25.02.2009 | |
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/37] | FI | 25.02.2009 | |
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | NL | 25.02.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH09117800 ; | [X]JPH1034183 ; | [X]US3787316 (BRINK E, et al) [X] 1,2 * figure 1; claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP0656234 (MINI RICERCA SCIENT TECNOLOG [IT]); | [XA]EP0659695 (ERICH KIESERLING GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-3,8 * page 2, line 52 - page 3, line 32; figures 1,2; claims 1,4,8 * [A] 4-7,9-14 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970930), vol. 1997, no. 09, & JP09117800 A 19970506 (KURITA WATER IND LTD) [X] 1,2,8 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 06, & JP10034183 A 19980210 (KURITA WATER IND LTD) [X] 1,2,8 * abstract * | Opposition | - "Vermeidung von Klärschlamm bei Abwasserreinigung in Kläranlagen", EUWID WASSER UND ABWASSER, (19990629), no. 13 | - "Biologische Zusatzstoffe in der Abwasserreinigung: Bakterien, Enzyme, Vitamine, Algenpräparate", ATV-ARBEITSBERICHTE, (1937), vol. 7, no. 90, pages 793 - 799 | - T. GSCHLÖßL ET AL., "Einsatz von biologischen Zusatzstoffen bei der Reinigung von kommunalem Abwasser", ABWASSERREINIGUNG, (1999), vol. 46, no. 12, pages 1880 - 1883 | - Z. BAKER ET AL., "Action of synthetic detergents on the metabolism of bacteria", J. EXPER. MED., (194102), vol. 73, no. 249, pages 249 - 271 | - Handelsregisterauszuge der Einsprechenden, der Bioserve GmbH | - O. STARK ET AL., "Überschusschlammvermeidung durch die Dosierung oberflächenaktiver Substanzen", WASSER - ABWASSER, (200111), vol. 42, no. 11, pages 756 - 760 | - DR.-ING. J. STRUNKHEIDE, "Überschussschlamm-Reduzierung mit Hilfe des Bioserve-Verfahrens am Beispiel der Kläranlagen Neuss-Süd und Lemke", IWB INSTITUT WASSER UND BODEN E.V., (2002), page 1 | - "Gelsenwasser steigert Umsatz um 2,2 Prozent auf 406 Mio. ?", EUWID WASSER UND ABWASSER, (20050426), no. 11, page 6 | - Bioserve-Verfahren: weniger Klärschlamm - weniger Kosten, DBU aktuell Nr. 3, Maärz 2005 | - SCHMID SCHMIEDER, Abfallwirtschaft in Forschung und Praxis, ERICH SCHMIDT VERLAG, vol. 134, pages 281 - 285 | - Innovationspreis Success 2005 für innovative Unternehmen www.stz.stz.rip.de/ir-start | - K. SÖLTER ET AL., "Ein Verfahren zur Überschussschlamm-Reduktion: Ergebnisse beim großtechnischen Einsatz", ZEITSCHRIFT FÜR UMWELTTECHNIK, (200109), no. 9, pages 26 - 29 | - "Doping für Mikroben, Abfall, Abwasser, Luft & Boden", ENTSORGA MAGAZIN ENTSORGUNGSWIRTSCHAFT, (200106), no. 6, pages 28 - 39 | - Eidesstattliche Erklärung, Herrn Stefan Broker, Bonn 29.11.2010 | - "Vermeidung von Klärschlamm bei Abwasserreinigung in Kläranlagen", EUWID WASSER UND ABWASSER, (19990629), no. 13, page 1 | - DR. K. KOSSWIG ET AL., Die Tenside, MÜNCHEN - WIEN, CARL HANSER VERLAG, (1993), pages 409 - 460 |