EP1065535 - Apparatus for fabricating apodized fiber grating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.09.2007 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2007 | Refusal of application | published on 10.10.2007 [2007/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Se-Yoon Saemmaeul Apt. 103-1801, Hogye-dong Tongan-gu, Anyang-shi, Kyonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Shin, Sang-Gil, c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 9th Fl., Samsung Plaza, 263, Seohyeon-Dong Pundang-Gu, Sungnam-Shi, Kyunggi-Do / KR | 03 /
Kim, Min-sung, c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 9th Fl., Samsung Plaza, 263, Seohyeon-Dong Pundang-Gu, Sungnam-Shi, Kyunggi-Do / KR | [2001/01] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00113502.9 | 26.06.2000 | [2001/01] | Priority number, date | KR19990026671 | 02.07.1999 Original published format: KR 9926671 | [2001/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1065535 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1065535 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | [2002/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/16, G02B6/34 | [2002/14] | CPC: |
G02B6/02138 (EP,US);
G02B6/00 (KR);
G02B6/02085 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/01] | G02B6/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/03] |
Former [2001/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Anordnung zur Herstellung von apodisierten Gittern in Lichtleitfasern | [2001/01] | English: | Apparatus for fabricating apodized fiber grating | [2001/01] | French: | Dispositif de fabrication d'un réseau de fibre optique apodisé | [2001/01] | Examination procedure | 26.06.2000 | Examination requested [2001/01] | 08.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.05.2007 | 15.05.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 22.05.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/41] | 03.06.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5652818 (BYRON KEVIN CHRISTOPHER [GB]) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0884613 (FRANCE TELECOM [FR]) [A] 1,5 * figures 3,4; claim 1 *; | [Y] - SINGH H ET AL, "APODIZED FIBER BRAGG GRATINGS FOR DWDM APPLICATIONS USING UNIFORM PHASE MASK", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 24TH EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON OPTICAL COMMUNICATION, (1998), vol. 1, pages 189 - 190, XP000901091 [Y] 1-10 * figures 1,3 * | [A] - FROHLICH H-G ET AL, "Two methods of apodisation of fibre-Bragg-gratings", OPTICS COMMUNICATIONS, NORTH-HOLLAND PUBLISHING CO. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19981201), vol. 157, no. 1-6, ISSN 0030-4018, pages 273 - 281, XP004150733 [A] 1,5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0030-4018(98)00539-2 |