EP1065412 - Speed change controller and control method of infinite speed ratio continuously variable transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.04.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. No.2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama city, Kanagawa / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | For all designated states Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. No.2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama city, Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muramoto, Itsuro 17-1-302, Tokiwadai, Hodogaya-ku Yokohama city, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Kawabe, Taketoshi 20-4, Oosone 2-chome, Kouhoku-ku Yokohama city, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Joe, Shin-ichiro E-314, 3-68, Oppamahigashi-cho Yokosuka City, Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
Narita, Yasushi 1914-2, Bukko-cho, Hodogaya-ku Yokohama city, Kanagawa / JP | 05 /
Sakai, Hiromasa C-306, Maronie-kan, 47, Funakoshi-cho 6-chome Yokosuka city, Kanagawa / JP | 06 /
Nishio, Motoharu 69-20, Shimonagaya 5-chome, Kounan-ku Yokohama city, Kanagawa / JP | [2001/06] |
Former [2001/01] | 01 /
Muramoto, Itsuro 17-1-302, Tokiwadai, Hodogaya-ku Yokohama city, Kanagawa / JP | ||
02 /
Kawabe, Taketoshi 20-4, Oosone 1-chome, Kouhoku-ku Yokohama city, Kanagawa / JP | |||
03 /
Joe, Shin-ichiro 68-e-314, Oppamahigashi-cho 3-chome Yokosuka city, Kanagawa / JP | |||
04 /
Narita, Yasushi 1914-2, Bukko-cho, Hodogaya-ku Yokohama city, Kanagawa / JP | |||
05 /
Sakai, Hiromasa C-306, Maronie-kan, 47, Funakoshi-cho 6-chome Yokosuka city, Kanagawa / JP | |||
06 /
Nishio, Motoharu 69-20, Shimonagaya 5-chome, Kounan-ku Yokohama city, Kanagawa / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00113594.6 | 27.06.2000 | [2001/01] | Priority number, date | JP19990181842 | 28.06.1999 Original published format: JP 18184299 | JP20000138161 | 11.05.2000 Original published format: JP 2000138161 | [2001/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1065412 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1065412 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | [2002/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/00, B60K41/22 | [2002/46] | CPC: |
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/02 (EP,US);
B60W10/10 (EP,US);
B60W10/109 (EP,US);
B60W10/115 (EP,US);
B60W30/18 (EP,US);
B60W30/1819 (EP,US);
B60W2510/1005 (EP,US);
F16H2037/0886 (EP,US);
F16H2061/6614 (EP,US);
F16H37/084 (EP,US);
F16H37/086 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/01] | F16H61/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/31] |
Former [2001/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gangwechsel-Steuervorrichtung und Verfahren eines stufenlosen Getriebes | [2001/01] | English: | Speed change controller and control method of infinite speed ratio continuously variable transmission | [2001/01] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de commande de changement de vitesse d'une transmission à variation continue | [2001/01] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2000 | Examination requested [2001/01] | 03.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/22] | 18.12.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19631236 (LUK GETRIEBE SYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,7-11 * column 11, line 63 - column 12, line 60; figures 5-10; claims 6-16 *; | [XP]JPH11210872 ; | [A]EP0899484 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US4464952 (STUBBS PETER W R [GB]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | [XP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991130), vol. 1999, no. 13, & JP11210872 A 19990803 (MAZDA MOTOR CORP) [XP] 1,9,10 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH10267116 | JPH0989071 | US5885185 | JP19990181842 | JP20000138161 |