EP1081544 - Apparatus for and method of projecting a digital image onto lightsensitive material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.04.2007 [2007/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2001/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haider, Peter Säbener Strasse 9 81547 München / DE | [2001/10] | Application number, filing date | 00113646.4 | 28.06.2000 | [2001/10] | Priority number, date | DE1999137417 | 07.08.1999 Original published format: DE 19937417 | [2001/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1081544 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1081544 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G03B27/72, G02B27/10, G02B26/08 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
H04N1/193 (EP,US);
G02B26/0833 (EP,US);
G02B27/1066 (EP,US);
G02B27/144 (EP,US);
G02B27/145 (EP,US);
G03B27/32 (EP,US);
H04N1/1934 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/10] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Belichten eines digitalen Bildes auf lichtempfindliches Material | [2001/10] | English: | Apparatus for and method of projecting a digital image onto lightsensitive material | [2001/10] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour projeter une image digitale sur un matériau photosensible | [2001/10] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/44] | 14.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 19.03.2003 | GR | 19.03.2003 | IE | 19.03.2003 | NL | 19.03.2003 | DK | 19.06.2003 | SE | 19.06.2003 | PT | 20.06.2003 | AT | 28.06.2003 | CY | 28.06.2003 | LU | 28.06.2003 | BE | 30.06.2003 | MC | 30.06.2003 | ES | 30.09.2003 | [2007/14] |
Former [2005/11] | FI | 19.03.2003 | |
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
IE | 19.03.2003 | ||
NL | 19.03.2003 | ||
DK | 19.06.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
PT | 20.06.2003 | ||
AT | 28.06.2003 | ||
CY | 28.06.2003 | ||
LU | 28.06.2003 | ||
MC | 30.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 19.03.2003 | |
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
IE | 19.03.2003 | ||
NL | 19.03.2003 | ||
DK | 19.06.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
PT | 20.06.2003 | ||
CY | 28.06.2003 | ||
LU | 28.06.2003 | ||
MC | 30.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | FI | 19.03.2003 | |
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
IE | 19.03.2003 | ||
NL | 19.03.2003 | ||
DK | 19.06.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
PT | 20.06.2003 | ||
CY | 28.06.2003 | ||
LU | 28.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | FI | 19.03.2003 | |
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
IE | 19.03.2003 | ||
NL | 19.03.2003 | ||
DK | 19.06.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
PT | 20.06.2003 | ||
CY | 28.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | FI | 19.03.2003 | |
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
IE | 19.03.2003 | ||
NL | 19.03.2003 | ||
DK | 19.06.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
PT | 20.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | FI | 19.03.2003 | |
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
IE | 19.03.2003 | ||
NL | 19.03.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
PT | 20.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | FI | 19.03.2003 | |
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
IE | 19.03.2003 | ||
NL | 19.03.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
PT | 20.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | FI | 19.03.2003 | |
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
NL | 19.03.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 19.03.2003 | |
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
NL | 19.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | FI | 19.03.2003 | |
NL | 19.03.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US5105299 (ANDERSON CHARLES H [US], et al) [AD] 1,3,6,8* column 2, line 38 - column 4, line 64; figures 1-8 *; | [A]US5164854 (TAKANASHI ITSUO [JP], et al) [A] 4 * column 2, line 48 - column 5, line 48; figures 1-5 *; | [X]US5704701 (KAVANAGH MARTIN [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,12 * column 3, line 19 - column 4, line 62; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5796526 (ANDERSON CHARLES H [US]) [A] 5,9 * column 2, line 63 - column 6, line 33; figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP0922986 (UNIC VIEW LTD [IL]) [X] 1,2,4,6-8 * column 3, line 10 - column 8, line 20; figures 1-7 *; | [E]EP1031874 (AGFA GEVAERT AG [DE]) [E] 1,10; | [D]DE19904750 (AGFA GEVAERT AG [DE]) |