EP1168074 - Method of producing an archive and package unit for film-cuttings out of a developed film and eventually an order card [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2002 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.08.2002 [2002/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honerkamp, Johannes Ebbendorfer Strasse 14 D-49176 Hilter / DE | [2002/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 33613 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 00113743.9 | 29.06.2000 | [2002/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1168074 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G03D15/00 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
G03D15/001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Archivierungs-Verpackungseinheit für aus einem entwickelten Film geschnittenen Filmabschitten und ggf.einer Nachbestellkarte | [2002/01] | English: | Method of producing an archive and package unit for film-cuttings out of a developed film and eventually an order card | [2002/01] | French: | Méthode de production d'une unité d'archivage et d'empaquetage pour films coupés d'un film developpé et éventuelllement une carte de commande | [2002/01] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2741598 (KIESER PAUL DRUCKEREI [DE]) [X] 1,6 * page 1 - page 4; figure 1 *; | [A]JPH113036 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990430), vol. 1999, no. 04, & JP11003036 A 19990106 (KONICA CORP) [A] 1,7 * abstract * |