EP1077094 - High pressure cleaning device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alfred Kärcher GmbH & Co. KG Alfred-Kärcher-Strasse 28-40 71364 Winnenden / DE | [2003/20] |
Former [2001/08] | For all designated states Alfred Kärcher GmbH & Co. Alfred-Kärcher-Strasse 28-40 71364 Winnenden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ruckwied, David Schlesierweg 7 70825 Korntal / DE | 02 /
Gerich, Josef Königsberger Ring 26 71364 Winnenden / DE | [2001/08] | Representative(s) | Boehme, Ulrich HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/08] | Böhme, Ulrich, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 00113889.0 | 30.06.2000 | [2001/08] | Priority number, date | DE1999214193U | 14.08.1999 Original published format: DE 29914193 U | [2001/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1077094 | Date: | 21.02.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1077094 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B08B3/02, B65H75/42 | [2001/08] | CPC: |
B65H75/425 (EP);
B08B3/026 (EP);
B08B2203/0276 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FR, IT, LI [2001/46] |
Former [2001/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Hochdruckreinigungsgerät | [2001/08] | English: | High pressure cleaning device | [2001/08] | French: | Appareil de nettoyage haute pression | [2001/08] | Examination procedure | 02.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/14] | 22.08.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 07.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.09.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3619326 (KRAENZLE JOSEF [DE]) [Y] 1,2,4,6-12 * column 3, line 25 - line 28 * * figure - *; | [Y]EP0446653 (MIGEN SRL [IT]) [Y] 1,2,4,6-12 * column 4, line 47 - line 53 * * column 5, line 9 - line 11 * * figure -; claim 10 *; | [A]EP0890394 (KAERCHER GMBH & CO ALFRED [DE]); | [A]DE29809473U (KAERCHER GMBH & CO ALFRED [DE]) |