EP1067572 - Cathode ray tube with indirectly heated cathode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/02] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koizumi, Sachio, c/o Hitachi Ltd., IP Group New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Komiya, Toshifumi, c/o Hitachi Ltd., IP Group New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Iwamura, Norio, c/o Hitachi Ltd., IP Group New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2001/02] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/02] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00114001.1 | 04.07.2000 | [2001/02] | Priority number, date | JP19990190154 | 05.07.1999 Original published format: JP 19015499 | [2001/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1067572 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1067572 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | [2002/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01J1/20, H01J29/04 | [2002/34] | CPC: |
H01J1/26 (EP);
H01J29/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/02] | H01J1/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/20] |
Former [2001/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kathodenstrahlröhre mit indirekt geheizter Kathode | [2001/02] | English: | Cathode ray tube with indirectly heated cathode | [2001/02] | French: | Tuba à rayons cathodiques avec cathode à chauffage indirect | [2001/02] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/07] | 07.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/28] | 22.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US5552661 (LEE GYEONG S [KR]) [Y] 1-3 * column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 5; figures 3,4 * [A] 4; | [Y]US4554479 (OPRESKO STEPHEN T [US]) [Y] 1,2 * column 3, line 3 - line 10; figure 3 *; | [Y]JPS58108628 ; | [A]JPS53145464 ; | [A]JPS5412254 ; | [A]DE2654554 (STANDARD ELEKTRIK LORENZ AG) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]US4379980 (TAKANASHI YUKIO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figure 7 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830921), vol. 007, no. 214, Database accession no. (E - 199), & JP58108628 A 19830628 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI KK) [Y] 1-3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19790214), vol. 003, no. 017, Database accession no. (E - 090), & JP53145464 A 19781218 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19790321), vol. 003, no. 034, Database accession no. (E - 099), & JP54012254 A 19790129 (NEC CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |