EP1069350 - Inertia brake control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2004 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Corporation Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/03] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davis, Alan Richard 649 Marsh Road Plainwell, MI 49080 / US | 02 /
Gooch, Douglas Craig 8086 North Yorkville Lane Richland, MI 49083 / US | 03 /
Ganski, Gerald Edward 60100 Spring Haven Court Lawton, MI 49065 / US | 04 /
Rozsi, Donald James 315 North Madison Street Marshall, MI 49068 / US | 05 /
Handley, Edward Francis 7654 Dunross Drive Portage, MI 49024, Kalamazoo / US | [2001/03] | Representative(s) | Rüger Abel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen a. N. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/03] | Patentanwälte Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 00114038.3 | 05.07.2000 | [2001/03] | Priority number, date | US19990351699 | 13.07.1999 Original published format: US 351699 | [2001/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1069350 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1069350 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/16, // F16H59:72 | [2001/03] | CPC: |
F16H61/0403 (EP,US);
F16D2121/20 (EP,US);
F16D2125/36 (EP,US);
F16D2127/08 (EP,US);
F16D2127/10 (EP,US);
F16H3/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/40] |
Former [2001/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Steuerung für Getriebeträgheitsbremse | [2001/03] | English: | Inertia brake control | [2001/03] | French: | Commande d'un frein d'inertie de transmission | [2001/03] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/18] | 18.07.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 26.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.08.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5425689 (GENISE THOMAS A [US]) [DA] 1,5,7 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0686789 (EATON CORP [US]) [DA] 1,5,7 * the whole document *; | [A]US5873426 (TABATA ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,5,7 * column 18, line 25 - column 21, line 10; figures 8,9 *; | [A]US5528950 (ORGANEK GREGORY J [US], et al) [A] 1,5,7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0826909 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,5,7 * the whole document * |