EP1095583 - Orientable pull-tab [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2002 | Change - extension states | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Accessorio Piu' S.r.l. Via della Republica, 41 24060 Cividino (Bergamo) / IT | [2001/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moreschi, Maria Rosa Via della Repubblica 64 24060 Cividino (Bergamo) / IT | [2001/18] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 00114116.7 | 10.07.2000 | [2001/18] | Priority number, date | IT1999MI00649U | 26.10.1999 Original published format: IT MI990649 U | [2001/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1095583 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A44B19/26 | [2001/18] | CPC: |
A44B19/262 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/04] |
Former [2001/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Lenkbare Zuglasche | [2001/18] | English: | Orientable pull-tab | [2001/18] | French: | Tirette orientable | [2001/18] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/51] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2302741 (CARLILE ALFRED E) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [XA]US1962479 (CARLILE ALFRED E) [X] 1,3 * page 1, line 60 - line 84; figures 1-4; claims 1,5 * [A] 2; | [X]FR756819 (A. RAYMOND) [X] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [XA]US3641634 (ASAI HIDEKAZU) [X] 1 * column W * [A] 2; | [A]DE29803628U (HEINRICH SOMMER GMBH [DE]) [A] 5 * the whole document * |