EP1160823 - Color cathode ray tube [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.02.2005 [2005/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8010 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kazuki, Ishii 271 Jo Sakura-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Hirofumi, Muto 271 Jo Sakura-shi Chiba-ken / JP | [2001/49] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00114174.6 | 12.07.2000 | [2001/49] | Priority number, date | JP20000169051 | 01.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000169051 | [2001/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1160823 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1160823 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | [2003/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01J29/32 | [2001/49] | CPC: |
H01J29/327 (EP,US);
H01J29/322 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/30] |
Former [2001/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Farbkathodenstrahlröhre | [2001/49] | English: | Color cathode ray tube | [2001/49] | French: | Tube couleur à rayons cathodiques | [2001/49] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/05] | 30.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.06.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0281379 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]US3686525 (NARUSE YOHSUKE, et al) [A] 1-21 * column W *; | [A]JPH08315747 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 1997, no. 03, & JP08315747 A 19961129 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-21 * abstract * |