EP1070754 - Flame protecting combination [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2006/11] |
Former [2001/04] | For all designated states Clariant GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schlosser, Elke Söllereckstrasse 32 86163 Augsburg / DE | 02 /
Nass, Bernd Bei den Sieben Kindeln 1 86152 Augsburg / DE | 03 /
Wanzke, Wolfgang, Dr. Mendelstrasse 11 a 86405 Meitingen / DE | [2001/04] | Application number, filing date | 00114379.1 | 05.07.2000 | [2001/04] | Priority number, date | DE1999133901 | 22.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19933901 | [2001/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1070754 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1070754 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | [2003/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1070754 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C09K21/14, C08K5/5313, C09K21/12 | [2003/38] | CPC: |
C09K21/12 (EP,US);
C08K5/34928 (EP,US);
C08K5/5313 (EP,US);
C09K21/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/04] | C09K21/14, C08K5/5313 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/04] | Title | German: | Flammschutzmittel-Kombination | [2001/04] | English: | Flame protecting combination | [2001/04] | French: | Combinaison pour protection contre les flammes | [2001/04] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/21] | 10.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.03.2008 | DK | 19.03.2008 | FI | 19.03.2008 | IE | 19.03.2008 | GR | 20.06.2008 | LU | 05.07.2008 | MC | 31.07.2008 | PT | 26.08.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/28] | CY | 19.03.2008 | |
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IE | 19.03.2008 | ||
LU | 05.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2010/21] | CY | 19.03.2008 | |
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IE | 19.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/49] | CY | 19.03.2008 | |
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FR | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/42] | CY | 19.03.2008 | |
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IE | 19.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | DK | 19.03.2008 | |
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IE | 19.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | DK | 19.03.2008 | |
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IE | 19.03.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | FI | 19.03.2008 | |
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 19.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4436281 (CHEMIE LINZ DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [A] 1,11 * claims 1,5,6 *; | [X]DE19614424 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,8,11,14-22 * example -; claim -; table 2 *; | [A]WO9845364 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1,11-16 * claims 1,7-10,13 *; | [X]WO9902606 (DSM NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-3,8-10,14-22 * page 6, line 23 - line 25 * * page 12, line 25 - page 13, line 2 * * claim 5 *; | [DA]DE19734437 (CLARIANT GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1-8,14-16,20-22 * claim - *; | [DA]DE19737727 (CLARIANT GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1,11,14-16,20-22* claim - *; | [PX]WO9967326 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [PX] 1-8,11-22 * page 26, lines 34,44 * * example -; claims 1,2 * |