EP1089215 - Optical sensing and control of movements using multiple passive sensors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.06.2004 [2004/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/14] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moghaddam, Baback 15 Bigelow Street Chambridge, MA 02139 / US | 02 /
Brand, Matthew E. 28 Maple Avenue Chambridge, MA 02139 / US | 03 /
Waters, Richard C. 65 Captain Miles Lane Concord, MA 01742 / US | 04 /
Freeman, William T. 16 Half Moon Hill Acton, MA 01720 / US | 05 /
Beardsley, Paul A. 12 Commonwealth Avenue Boston, MA 02116 / US | [2001/14] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/14] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner Mozartstrasse 17 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00114434.4 | 05.07.2000 | [2001/14] | Priority number, date | US19990395551 | 14.09.1999 Original published format: US 395551 | [2001/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1089215 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06K11/08 | [2001/14] | CPC: |
G06F3/011 (EP);
G06F3/0304 (EP);
G06T7/248 (EP);
G06V10/955 (EP);
G06T2207/30204 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/14] | Title | German: | Optische Abtastung und Steuerung von Bewegungen mit mehreren passiven Fühlern | [2001/14] | English: | Optical sensing and control of movements using multiple passive sensors | [2001/14] | French: | Détection optique et commande de mouvements par plusieurs capteurs passifs | [2001/14] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/22] | 23.04.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9921122 (ASCENT TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [X] 1-3,6,10 * page 19, line 34 - page 22, line 11 * * page 23, lines 1-13 * * figures 4-5D * [A] 12; | [A]EP0767443 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-3,12 * column 5, line 38 - column 11, line 51 * * figures 1,5,7-11 *; | [A]EP0773494 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-3,12 * column 5, lines 6-34 * * column 11, lines 26-39 * * figures 4-6,10 * |