EP1081538 - Optical element having electrically controllable refractive index [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2005 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.04.2005 [2005/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. (A Delaware Corporation) 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto CA 94303 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/32] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies Inc. a Delaware Corporation 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/31] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies Inc. a Delaware Corporation 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies Inc 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94306-2024 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Yong 3074 Emerson Street Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 02 /
Corzine, Scott W. 1354 Egret Drive Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US | 03 /
Wang, Shih-Yuan 766 Encina Granda Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | [2001/10] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Eva Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | Liesegang, Eva Forrester & Boehmert, Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00114523.4 | 06.07.2000 | [2001/10] | Priority number, date | US19990389917 | 03.09.1999 Original published format: US 389917 | [2001/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1081538 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1081538 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | [2003/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/19, G02F1/315, G02F1/21, G11C13/04 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
G11C13/041 (EP,US);
G02F1/19 (EP,US);
G02F1/21 (EP,US);
G02F1/315 (EP,US);
G02F2203/02 (EP,US);
G02F2203/023 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/19] |
Former [2001/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Optisches Element mit elektrisch regelbarem Brechungsindex | [2001/10] | English: | Optical element having electrically controllable refractive index | [2001/10] | French: | Elément optique à indice de réfraction électrocommandable | [2001/10] | Examination procedure | 14.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/12] | 07.03.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0818706 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1 * column 5, line 35 - column 6, line 3; figure 1 *; | [Y]US5905590 (VAN DER SLUIS PAUL [NL], et al) [Y] 1-4 * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 18 * * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 37 ** column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 25 *; | [XA] - HALE J S ET AL, "PROSPECTS FOR IR EMISSIVITY CONTROL USING ELECTROCHROMIC STRUCTURES", THIN SOLID FILMS, ELSEVIER-SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, CH, (19990208), vol. 339, no. 1/2, ISSN 0040-6090, pages 174 - 180, XP001016490 [X] 1,3 * page 175, column R - page 176; figures 2,6 * [A] 2,4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-6090(98)01335-2 | [Y] - ROTTKAY VON K ET AL, "REFRACTIVE INDEX CHANGES OF PD-COATED MAGNESIUM LANTHANIDE SWITCHABLE MIRRORS UPON HYDROGEN INSERTION", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (1999), vol. 85, no. 1, ISSN 0021-8979, pages 408 - 413, XP000823020 [Y] 1-4 * page 410 - page 411, column L, paragraph 1; figures 6,7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.369399 |