EP1067716 - Wide-band optical fiber amplifier and amplifying method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.2006 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/02] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoon, Soo-Young 14, Shingal-ri, Kihung-up Yongin-shi, Kyonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Hwang, Seong-Teak c/o SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO.LTD 9th Fl.Samsung Plaza 263,Seohyeon-Dong,Pundang-Gu Sungnam-Shi, Kyunggi-So / KR | 03 /
Jung, Rae-Sung SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO. LTD. 9th Fl.Samsung Plaza,263 Seohyeon-Dong,Pundang-Gu Sungnam-Shi, Kyunggi-Do / KR | 04 /
Kim, Jeong-Mee c/o SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO.LTD. 9th FL., Samsung Plaza 263 Seohyeon-Dong Pundang-Gu, Sangnam-Shi, Kyunggi-Do / KR | 05 /
Kim, Sung-Jun 468, Tokgok-dong, Songtan-jiyok Pyongtaek-shi, Kyonggi-do / KR | [2001/08] |
Former [2001/02] | 01 /
Yoon, Soo-Young 14, Shingal-ri, Kihung-up Yongin-shi, Kyonggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
Hwang, Seong-Teak 491, Tokgok-dong, Songtan-jiyok Pyongtaek-shi, Kyonggi-cho / KR | |||
03 /
Jung, Rae-Sung, Hwanggolmaeul Jugong 1-danji Apt. 132-2002, Youngtong-dong, Paltal-gu Suwon-shi, Kyonggi-do / KR | |||
04 /
Kim, Jeong-Mee c/o SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO.LTD. 9th FL., Samsung Plaza 263 Seohyeon-Dong Pundang-Gu, Sangnam-Shi, Kyunggi-Do / KR | |||
05 /
Kim, Sung-Jun 468, Tokgok-dong, Songtan-jiyok Pyongtaek-shi, Kyonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/02] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00114630.7 | 07.07.2000 | [2001/02] | Priority number, date | KR19990027276 | 07.07.1999 Original published format: KR 9927276 | [2001/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1067716 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1067716 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | [2001/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/17, H01S3/067 | [2001/48] | CPC: |
H04B10/294 (EP,US);
G02F1/39 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2001/02] | H04B10/17 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/33] |
Former [2001/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Breitbandiger faseroptischer Verstärker und Verstärkungsverfahren dafür | [2001/02] | English: | Wide-band optical fiber amplifier and amplifying method thereof | [2001/02] | French: | Amplificateur à fibre optique à large bande et sa méthode d'amplification | [2001/02] | Examination procedure | 07.07.2000 | Examination requested [2001/02] | 13.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/22] | 02.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]FR2786325 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [PX] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [PX] - BUMKI MIN ET AL, "Performance improvement of wideband EDFA by ASE injection from C band to L band amplifier", ASIA-PACIFIC CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS AND OPTOELECTRONICS ANDCOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE. APCC/OECC. PROCEEDINGS. CONFERENCE VITALITY TO THE NEW CENTURY,XX,XX, (19991018), vol. 2, pages 1346 - 1347, XP002154432 [PX] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/APCC.1999.820515 | [A] - LEE J H ET AL, "IMPROVEMENT OF 1.57-1.61 MUM BAND AMPLIFICATION EFFICIENCY BY RECYCLING WASTED BACKWARD ASE THROUGH THE UNPUMPED EDF SECTION", SAN DIEGO, CA, FEB. 21 - 26, 1999,NEW YORK, NY: IEEE,US, (1999), ISBN 0-7803-5430-3, pages 7 - 9, XP000882916 [A] 1-3 * page 8, line 28 - line 34; figure 1 * | [A] - SUN Y ET AL, "80 nm ultra-wideband erbium-doped silica fibre amplifier", ELECTRONICS LETTERS,IEE STEVENAGE,GB, (19971106), vol. 33, no. 23, ISSN 0013-5194, pages 1965 - 1967, XP006008152 [A] 1 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:19971305 |