Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001057454 | Global Dossier | 27.02.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19990027276 | 07.07.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1067716 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2001 | A3 | EP1067716 | 10.01.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR19990027276 | 07.07.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100330209B | 25.03.2002 | B1 | KR20010009100 | 05.02.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19990027276 | 07.07.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6437907 | 20.08.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | KR19990027276 | 07.07.1999 |