EP1067154 - Thermoplastic resin composition and multilayered container using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KURARAY CO., LTD. 1621, Sakazu, Kurashiki-City Okayama-Pref. / JP | [2008/37] |
Former [2001/02] | For all designated states Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621, Sakazu, Kurashiki-City Okayama-Pref. / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tai, Shinji, c/o Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-City, Okayama-Pref. / JP | 02 /
Nakaya, Masakazu, c/o Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-City, Okayama-Pref. / JP | 03 /
Shimo, Hiroyuki, c/o Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-City, Okayama-Pref. / JP | 04 /
Sato, Toshiaki, c/o Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-City, Okayama-Pref. / JP | 05 /
Yamashita, Takashi, c/o Kuraray Co., Ltd. 41, Miyukigaoka Tsukuba-City, Ibaraki-Pref. / JP | 06 /
Mukoo, Yoshiki, c/o Kuraray Co., Ltd. 41, Miyukigaoka Tsukuba-City, Ibaraki-Pref. / JP | [2001/02] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/02] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00114801.4 | 10.07.2000 | [2001/02] | Priority number, date | JP19990194227 | 08.07.1999 Original published format: JP 19422799 | [2001/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1067154 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1067154 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | [2002/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1067154 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C08L51/00, C08L51/04, C08L29/04, C08L67/00, C08L77/00, C08K3/00, B32B27/08 | [2001/02] | CPC: |
B32B27/18 (EP,US);
C08L29/04 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/08 (KR,US);
B32B27/306 (US);
B32B27/34 (US);
B32B27/36 (US);
C08K3/24 (KR);
C08K5/098 (EP,US);
C08L51/003 (EP,US);
C08L51/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08L77/00 (EP,US);
C08L77/02 (EP,US);
C08L77/06 (EP,US);
B32B2367/00 (US);
B32B2377/00 (US);
B32B2439/00 (US);
C08K2201/012 (EP,US);
C08L51/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1372 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1379 (EP,US);
Y10T428/254 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2998 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/098, C08L51/003 (US,EP);
C08L29/04, C08L2666/24 (US,EP);
C08L51/003, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L51/003, C08L2666/14 (US,EP);
C08L51/04, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L51/04, C08L2666/14 (EP,US);
C08L77/00, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L77/00, C08L53/00 (EP,US);
C08L77/02, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L77/02, C08L53/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/48] |
Former [2001/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Thermoplastische Harzzusammensetzung und mehrschichtiger diese verwendender Behälter | [2008/37] | English: | Thermoplastic resin composition and multilayered container using the same | [2001/02] | French: | Composition de résine thermoplastique et récipient multicouche utilisant celle-ci | [2008/37] |
Former [2001/02] | Thermoplastische Harzzusammensetzung und mehrschichtiger Behälter daraus | ||
Former [2001/02] | Composition de résine thermoplstique et récipient multicouche obtenu à partir de celle-ci | Examination procedure | 22.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/26] | 26.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0546546 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,3-10 * page 3, column 11, line 14 * * page 3, line 44 - line 46 * * page 4, line 1 - line 8 * * page 4, line 14 * * page 4, line 21 - line 22; claim 4 *; | [D]JPH05156095 ; | [D]JPH05170980 ; | [YA]JPH10182755 ; | [A]EP0525240 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,3-10,12-16 * claim 2 *; | [D]JPH04211444 ; | [A]JPH06179792 | [D] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, & JPH05156095 A 19930622 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [D] * abstract * | [D] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, & JPH05170980 A 19930709 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [D] * abstract * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981031), vol. 1998, no. 12, & JP10182755 A 19980707 (KURARAY CO LTD) [Y] 1,3-10 * abstract * [A] 2,11 | [D] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, & JPH04211444 A 00000000 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [D] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940930), vol. 018, no. 520, Database accession no. (C - 1255), & JP06179792 A 19940628 (KURARAY CO LTD) [A] 2-10 * abstract * |