EP1077112 - Device for clamping workpieces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gustav Weeke Maschinenbau GmbH Brocker Strasse 30-36 33442 Herzebrock-Clarholz / DE | [2010/09] |
Former [2001/08] | For all designated states Gustav Weeke Maschinenbau GmbH Brocker Strasse 30-36 33442 Herzebrock-Clarholz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Voss, Hugo, Dipl.-Ing. Blumenweg 24 33449 Langeberg / DE | 02 /
Heimann, Reinhard, Dipl.-Ing. Ossietzky Strasse 57 33335 Gütersloh / DE | 03 /
Brinkhaus, Werner Peitzmeierweg 9 33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE | [2001/08] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/08] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00114959.0 | 19.07.2000 | [2001/08] | Priority number, date | DE1999138851 | 17.08.1999 Original published format: DE 19938851 | [2001/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1077112 | Date: | 21.02.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1077112 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | [2002/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1077112 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B25B5/06, B25B11/00 | [2001/08] | CPC: |
B25B11/005 (EP);
B25B11/007 (EP);
B25B5/061 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/08] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Spannen von Werkstücken | [2001/08] | English: | Device for clamping workpieces | [2001/08] | French: | Dispositif pour serrer des pièces à travailler | [2001/08] | Examination procedure | 13.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2007 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 15.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2008 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 18.09.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.10.2009 | 02.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.10.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.09.2003 | 31.07.2005 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.10.2005 | 31.07.2007 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.03.2010 | DK | 03.03.2010 | FI | 03.03.2010 | IE | 03.03.2010 | IT | 03.03.2010 | NL | 03.03.2010 | SE | 03.03.2010 | GR | 04.06.2010 | ES | 14.06.2010 | PT | 05.07.2010 | AT | 19.07.2010 | GB | 19.07.2010 | LU | 19.07.2010 | BE | 31.07.2010 | CH | 31.07.2010 | LI | 31.07.2010 | MC | 31.07.2010 | FR | 02.08.2010 | [2012/44] |
Former [2012/01] | CY | 03.03.2010 | |
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
IT | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
AT | 19.07.2010 | ||
GB | 19.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
FR | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CY | 03.03.2010 | |
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
IT | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
GB | 19.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
FR | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/31] | CY | 03.03.2010 | |
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
IT | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
FR | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | CY | 03.03.2010 | |
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
IT | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | CY | 03.03.2010 | |
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
IT | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | CY | 03.03.2010 | |
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | CY | 03.03.2010 | |
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | CY | 03.03.2010 | |
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | CY | 03.03.2010 | |
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/47] | CY | 03.03.2010 | |
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | FI | 03.03.2010 | |
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | FI | 03.03.2010 | |
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | FI | 03.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1161519 (ERWIN LOTHAR HOLLAND MERTEN) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,11,18-21 * the whole document *; | [A]US3476377 (AGRISTA DOMINIC S, et al) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US5312094 (ZERA ROBERT D [US]) [A] 1,6 * column A; figure - *; | [DA]DE4404413 (KLESSMANN IMA NORTE MASCHFAB [DE]); | [A]US5883522 (O'BOYLE JOHN O [US]) [A] 1-3,6 * column A; figure - *; | [A]US5899445 (KIMBLE ALVIN J [US]) [A] 1 * column 11, line 12 - line 33; figure 15 * |