EP1081417 - Apparatus and method for controlling the release of a clutch in a motor vehicle transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cappelmann, Bernd Heideweg 4 38167 Wendeburg / DE | 02 /
Fähland, Jörg, Dipl.-Ing. Auf dem Berge 9 38524 Sassenburg / DE | 03 /
Damm, Ansgar, Dr. Theodor-Heuss-Str. 2 38518 Gifhorn / DE | [2001/10] | Application number, filing date | 00115046.5 | 26.07.2000 | [2001/10] | Priority number, date | DE1999141011 | 28.08.1999 Original published format: DE 19941011 | [2001/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1081417 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1081417 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | [2001/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1081417 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/30, F16D48/06 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
F16H61/2807 (EP);
F16H61/30 (EP);
F16H2061/2823 (EP);
F16H2306/46 (EP);
F16H59/141 (EP);
F16H59/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren bzw. Vorrichtung zur Steuerung des Ausrückens eines in einem Kraftfahrzeuggetriebe vorgesehenen Kupplungsgliedes | [2001/10] | English: | Apparatus and method for controlling the release of a clutch in a motor vehicle transmission | [2001/10] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour commander le débrayage d'un embrayage dans une transmission de véhicule automobile | [2001/10] | Examination procedure | 14.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/29] | 20.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.01.2004 | FI | 07.01.2004 | IE | 07.01.2004 | NL | 07.01.2004 | DK | 07.04.2004 | GR | 07.04.2004 | SE | 07.04.2004 | ES | 18.04.2004 | PT | 07.06.2004 | AT | 26.07.2004 | LU | 26.07.2004 | BE | 31.07.2004 | CH | 31.07.2004 | LI | 31.07.2004 | MC | 31.07.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/08] | CY | 07.01.2004 | |
FI | 07.01.2004 | ||
IE | 07.01.2004 | ||
NL | 07.01.2004 | ||
DK | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.04.2004 | ||
ES | 18.04.2004 | ||
AT | 26.07.2004 | ||
LU | 26.07.2004 | ||
BE | 31.07.2004 | ||
CH | 31.07.2004 | ||
LI | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2006/12] | FI | 07.01.2004 | |
IE | 07.01.2004 | ||
NL | 07.01.2004 | ||
DK | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.04.2004 | ||
ES | 18.04.2004 | ||
AT | 26.07.2004 | ||
LU | 26.07.2004 | ||
BE | 31.07.2004 | ||
CH | 31.07.2004 | ||
LI | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | FI | 07.01.2004 | |
IE | 07.01.2004 | ||
DK | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.04.2004 | ||
ES | 18.04.2004 | ||
LU | 26.07.2004 | ||
BE | 31.07.2004 | ||
CH | 31.07.2004 | ||
LI | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/25] | FI | 07.01.2004 | |
IE | 07.01.2004 | ||
DK | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.04.2004 | ||
ES | 18.04.2004 | ||
LU | 26.07.2004 | ||
CH | 31.07.2004 | ||
LI | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 07.01.2004 | |
IE | 07.01.2004 | ||
DK | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.04.2004 | ||
ES | 18.04.2004 | ||
LU | 26.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | FI | 07.01.2004 | |
IE | 07.01.2004 | ||
DK | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.04.2004 | ||
ES | 18.04.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | FI | 07.01.2004 | |
IE | 07.01.2004 | ||
DK | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.04.2004 | ||
ES | 18.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 07.01.2004 | |
DK | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.04.2004 | ||
ES | 18.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | FI | 07.01.2004 | |
GR | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.04.2004 | ||
ES | 18.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 07.01.2004 | |
GR | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 07.01.2004 | |
SE | 07.04.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS636258 ; | [A]JPS62266254 ; | [DA]DE3513279 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * page 5, paragraph 2; figure - *; | [A]DE19637001 (LUK GETRIEBE SYSTEME GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 23 - column 8, line 27; figures 13-15; claim 14 *; | [A]EP0789171 (EATON CORP [US]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 58; figures 1-3 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880610), vol. 012, no. 201, Database accession no. (M - 707), & JP63006258 A 19880112 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880506), vol. 012, no. 145, Database accession no. (M - 693), & JP62266254 A 19871119 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | DE3513279 | DE3531279 |