Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1077111
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
10.12.2004 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 26.01.2005 [2005/04] |
31.08.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
18.08.2004 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
14.05.2004 |
Change - representative |
published on 30.06.2004 [2004/27] |
26.03.2004 |
Change - applicant |
published on 12.05.2004 [2004/20] |
03.03.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.02.2004 |
Change - German title |
published on 14.04.2004 [2004/16] |
02.08.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.08.2002 |
Change - applicant |
published on 02.10.2002 [2002/40] |
31.07.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
20.06.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
04.02.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
24.01.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
13.12.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
28.09.2001 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 14.11.2001 [2001/46] |
22.08.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
14.08.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
06.04.2001 |
First examination report |
|
30.03.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
30.03.2001 |
Request for accelerated examination |
|
05.01.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.02.2001 [2001/08] |
05.01.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.02.2001 [2001/08] |
02.01.2001 |
Request for accelerated examination |
|