EP1077111 - Method and tool for abrasive machining of a substantially flat surface, production and use of the tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/08] | Method and tool for abrasive machining of a substantially flat surface | ||
[2004/16] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.12.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.01.2005 [2005/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siltronic AG Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [2004/20] |
Former [2002/40] | For all designated states Wacker Siltronic AG Johannes-Hess-Strasse 24 84489 Burghausen / DE | ||
Former [2001/08] | For all designated states Wacker Siltronic Gesellschaft für Halbleitermaterialien Aktiengesellschaft Johannes-Hess-Strasse 24 84489 Burghausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ripper, Bert Finkenweg 6 02353 Postbauer-Heng / DE | 02 /
Grubmüller, Hubert Jeging 29 5222 Munderfing / AT | [2001/08] | Representative(s) | Rimböck, Karl-Heinz Siltronic AG Corporate Intellectual Property Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | Rimböck, Karl-Heinz, Dr. c/o Siltronic AG Corporate Intellectual Property Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/08] | Rimböck, Karl-Heinz, Dr., et al c/o Wacker-Chemie GmbH Zentralabteilung PML Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00115098.6 | 27.07.2000 | [2001/08] | Priority number, date | DE1999139258 | 19.08.1999 Original published format: DE 19939258 | [2001/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1077111 | Date: | 21.02.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B24D7/06, B24B37/04, B24D7/10, B24B53/02 | [2001/08] | CPC: |
B24B37/16 (EP,US);
H01L21/304 (KR);
B24B37/26 (EP,US);
B24B53/017 (EP,US);
B24D7/06 (EP,US);
B24D7/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2001/46] |
Former [2001/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Werkzeug und Verfahren zum abrasiven Bearbeiten einer im wesentlichen ebenen Fläche, Herstellung und Verwendung des Werkzeuges | [2004/16] | English: | Method and tool for abrasive machining of a substantially flat surface, production and use of the tool | [2004/16] | French: | Procédé et outil pour l'usinage abrasif d'une surface substantiellement plane, sa prépararation et son utilisation | [2004/16] |
Former [2001/08] | Werkzeug und Verfahren zum abrasiven Bearbeiten einer im wesentlichen ebenen Fläche | ||
Former [2001/08] | Method and tool for abrasive machining of a substantially flat surface | ||
Former [2001/08] | Procédé et outil pour l'usinage abrasif d'une surface substantiellement plane | Examination procedure | 27.07.2000 | Examination requested [2001/08] | 27.07.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 04.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 02.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/04] | 23.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4918872 (SATO TAKESI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6,9,11,13 * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 17; figure - * [Y] 2,12; | [X]EP0478912 (WOLTERS PETER FA [DE]) [X] 1,3-6,9,10 * column 2, line 11 - line 21; figure -; claims 10-12 *; | [Y]US4471579 (BOVENSIEPEN HANS-JOACHIM [DE]) [Y] 2,12 * abstract *; | [XA]US5938506 (FRUITMAN CLINTON [US], et al) [X] 7 * column 2, line 50 - line 63; figures 3,5 * [A] 8 |