EP1069599 - Apparatus for deposition of thin films on wafers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.11.2010 [2010/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MooHan Co., Ltd 106, Dasankwan Venturetown, 1687-2, Sinil-dong Daeduck-ku Dae Jeun Megacity 306-230 / KR | [2009/50] |
Former [2001/03] | For all designated states MooHan Co., Ltd 106, Dasankwan Venturetown, 1687-2, Sinil-dong Daeduck-ku, Dae Jeun Megacity 306-230 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Yong il 311-204, Songgang Green Apt., 199 Songgang-dong Yousung-ku, Dae Jeun Megacity 305-751 / KR | 02 /
Shin, Joong Ho 312-1403, Songgang Green Apt., 199 Songgang-dong Yousung-ku, Dae Jeun Megacity 305-751 / KR | 03 /
Yun, Yeo Heung 203-801, Songgang maeul Apt., 10-3 Songgang-dong Yousung-ku, Dae Jeun Megacity 305-802 / KR | [2001/03] | Representative(s) | Merkle, Gebhard Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/03] | Merkle, Gebhard TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00115133.1 | 12.07.2000 | [2001/03] | Priority number, date | KR19990028609 | 15.07.1999 Original published format: KR 9928609 | [2001/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1069599 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1069599 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | [2002/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1069599 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00 | [2001/03] | CPC: |
C23C16/45544 (EP,US);
H01L21/20 (KR);
C23C16/4412 (EP,US);
C23C16/45519 (EP,US);
C23C16/45561 (EP,US);
C23C16/4584 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2003/35] |
Former [2001/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Abscheidung von Dünnschichten auf Wafern | [2001/03] | English: | Apparatus for deposition of thin films on wafers | [2001/03] | French: | Appareil de déposition de films minces sur des plaquettes semiconductrices | [2001/03] | Examination procedure | 04.06.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/32] | 01.07.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.09.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 26.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.07.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05179428 ; | [A]JPH0982593 ; | [A]JPH01140712 ; | [X]US3437043 (SANDERS DAVID H, et al) [X] 20* the whole document *; | [A]US4513021 (PURDES ANDREW J [US], et al) [A] 19 * the whole document *; | [A]US4820106 (WALDE MICHAEL [DE], et al) [A] 1-6 * figures 3,5 *; | [X]US4911101 (BALLINGALL III JAMES M [US], et al) [X] 7-11,13,14 * figure 3 * * the whole document *; | [X]US5522934 (SUZUKI AKIRA [JP], et al) [X] 19 * the whole document * * figure 2 *; | [A]US5575854 (JINNOUCHI SHIMPEI [JP], et al) [A] 7-14 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9714180 (SEMITOOL INC [US], et al) [X] 7-14 * the whole document * * claims 1-140 *; | [X]US5647945 (MATSUSE KIMIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 7-11,13,14,19 * column 1, line 30 - line 67 * * column 16, line 35 - line 45 * * column 20, line 42 - line 62 * * claims 1,2 * * figures 4,5,7,8 *; | [X]US5683518 (MOORE GARY M [US], et al) [X] 1-6,15-18 * column 19, line 65 - column 20, line 14 * * figures 2B,14 * * claims 1-51 *; | [XA]WO9744820 (C V RESEARCH CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 [A] 15-18; | [A]EP0833374 (KOKUSAI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * figures 7-10 *; | US6030459 [ ] (KAWAURA HIROSHI [JP]) [ ] * the whole document *; | [PX]US6048798 (GADGIL PRASHANT [US], et al) [PX] 19 * column 4, line 40 - column 5, line 36 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931102), vol. 017, no. 597, Database accession no. (C - 1127), & JP05179428 A 19930720 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970731), vol. 1997, no. 07, & JP09082593 A 19970328 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890904), vol. 013, no. 396, Database accession no. (E - 815), & JP01140712 A 19890601 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 7-14 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * | Examination | EP0445596 | by applicant | US5683518 |