EP1069376 - Method for reducing NOx emissions in liquid fuel combustion processes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2005 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carbofuel S.p.A. Via A. Colombo, 110 21055 Gorla Minore (Varese) / IT | For all designated states SIRAM S.P.A. Via Bisceglie 95 20152 Milano (MI) / IT | [2003/35] |
Former [2001/03] | For all designated states Carbofuel S.p.A. Via A. Colombo, 110 21055 Gorla Minore (Varese) / IT | ||
For all designated states DALKIA S.r.l. Via Sempione, 230 20016 Pero (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carpaneto, Giacomo Via A. Colombo, 110 21055 Gorla Minore (Varese) / IT | 02 /
De Boni, Aldo Via Sempione, 230 20016 Pero (Milano) / IT | [2001/03] | Representative(s) | Cicogna, Franco, et al Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/35] | Cicogna, Franco, et al Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2001/03] | Cicogna, Franco Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 00115216.4 | 13.07.2000 | [2001/03] | Priority number, date | IT1999MI01575 | 15.07.1999 Original published format: IT MI991575 | [2001/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1069376 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1069376 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F23J7/00 | [2001/03] | CPC: |
B01D53/56 (EP);
F23J7/00 (EP);
B01D2251/2067 (EP);
F23G2207/60 (EP);
F23J2219/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verminderung von NOx Emissionen in Verbrennungsverfahren von Flüssigbrennstoffen | [2001/03] | English: | Method for reducing NOx emissions in liquid fuel combustion processes | [2001/03] | French: | Procédé pour la réduction des émissions de NOx pour les procédés de combustion de fuel liquide | [2001/03] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/22] | 25.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   04.09.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.02.2005 | BE | 09.02.2005 | CH | 09.02.2005 | FI | 09.02.2005 | FR | 09.02.2005 | LI | 09.02.2005 | NL | 09.02.2005 | DK | 09.05.2005 | GR | 09.05.2005 | SE | 09.05.2005 | DE | 10.05.2005 | ES | 20.05.2005 | PT | 09.07.2005 | CY | 13.07.2005 | GB | 13.07.2005 | IE | 13.07.2005 | LU | 13.07.2005 | MC | 31.07.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/26] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
BE | 09.02.2005 | ||
CH | 09.02.2005 | ||
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
FR | 09.02.2005 | ||
LI | 09.02.2005 | ||
NL | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
GR | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
DE | 10.05.2005 | ||
ES | 20.05.2005 | ||
CY | 13.07.2005 | ||
GB | 13.07.2005 | ||
IE | 13.07.2005 | ||
LU | 13.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
BE | 09.02.2005 | ||
CH | 09.02.2005 | ||
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
FR | 09.02.2005 | ||
LI | 09.02.2005 | ||
NL | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
GR | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
DE | 10.05.2005 | ||
ES | 20.05.2005 | ||
CY | 13.07.2005 | ||
GB | 13.07.2005 | ||
IE | 13.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
BE | 09.02.2005 | ||
CH | 09.02.2005 | ||
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
FR | 09.02.2005 | ||
LI | 09.02.2005 | ||
NL | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
GR | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
DE | 10.05.2005 | ||
ES | 20.05.2005 | ||
GB | 13.07.2005 | ||
IE | 13.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/35] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
BE | 09.02.2005 | ||
CH | 09.02.2005 | ||
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
FR | 09.02.2005 | ||
LI | 09.02.2005 | ||
NL | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
GR | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
DE | 10.05.2005 | ||
ES | 20.05.2005 | ||
GB | 13.07.2005 | ||
IE | 13.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/31] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
BE | 09.02.2005 | ||
CH | 09.02.2005 | ||
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
FR | 09.02.2005 | ||
LI | 09.02.2005 | ||
NL | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
GR | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
DE | 10.05.2005 | ||
ES | 20.05.2005 | ||
IE | 13.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
BE | 09.02.2005 | ||
CH | 09.02.2005 | ||
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
LI | 09.02.2005 | ||
NL | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
GR | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
DE | 10.05.2005 | ||
ES | 20.05.2005 | ||
IE | 13.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
BE | 09.02.2005 | ||
CH | 09.02.2005 | ||
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
LI | 09.02.2005 | ||
NL | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
GR | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
DE | 10.05.2005 | ||
ES | 20.05.2005 | ||
IE | 13.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
BE | 09.02.2005 | ||
CH | 09.02.2005 | ||
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
LI | 09.02.2005 | ||
NL | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
GR | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
DE | 10.05.2005 | ||
ES | 20.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/18] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
BE | 09.02.2005 | ||
CH | 09.02.2005 | ||
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
LI | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
GR | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
DE | 10.05.2005 | ||
ES | 20.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
BE | 09.02.2005 | ||
CH | 09.02.2005 | ||
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
LI | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
GR | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
ES | 20.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
BE | 09.02.2005 | ||
CH | 09.02.2005 | ||
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
LI | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
ES | 20.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
BE | 09.02.2005 | ||
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | FI | 09.02.2005 | |
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 09.02.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE4306765 (BAUR PETER [DE]) [Y] 6 * column 1, line 3 - line 9 * * column 1, line 27 - line 47 * * column 1, line 56 - line 61 * * column 2, line 24 - line 53 * * column 2, line 68 - column 3, line 5 * [A] 7,8; | [XY]DE4429054 (FRITZ UTE DIPL ING [DE]) [X] 1,5,11 * page 2, line 51 - line 59 * * page 3, line 10 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 3,6; | [Y]DE29515904U (JOHANN BISCHL FEINMECHANIK GMB [DE]) [Y] 7-10 * figure 1 * * page 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 2, paragraph 3 *; | [A]EP0844014 (SOGEA [FR]) [A] 7-9 * column 5, line 2 - line 5 * * column 5, line 20 - line 28 * * column 16, line 25 - line 49 ** figure 3 *; | [Y]DE19713136 (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 7-10 * column 1, line 14 - line 18 * * column 2, line 5 - line 39 *; | [X]DE19728344 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]) [X] 1,2,11 * column 1, line 5 - line 7 * * column 1, line 23 - line 29 * * column 3, line 37 - line 42 * * column 4, line 2 - line 22; figure 1 * * column 2, line 5 - line 39 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]DE19731546 (ERC EMISSIONS REDUZIERUNGS CON [DE]) [Y] 3 * page 2, line 3 - line 6 * * page 2, line 49 - line 50 * * page 3, line 4 - line 5 * * page 3, line 15 - line 40 * * page 4, line 1 - line 27 * * page 54, line 39 - line 49 * |