14.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] |
25.05.2007 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] |
13.04.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] |
19.01.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] |
28.07.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2006 [2006/35] |
30.06.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.08.2006 [2006/31] |
09.06.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.07.2006 [2006/28] |
19.05.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.06.2006 [2006/25] |
14.04.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] |
17.03.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.05.2006 [2006/18] |
17.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
03.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2006 [2006/12] |
16.12.2005 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 01.02.2006 [2006/05] |
04.11.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2005 [2005/51] |
14.10.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2005 [2005/48] |
30.09.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] |
24.12.2004 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.02.2005 [2005/06] |
22.12.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
22.12.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
14.09.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
14.09.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.08.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
06.08.2004 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
31.07.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.07.2003 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.07.2003 |
Change - applicant |
published on 27.08.2003 [2003/35] |
11.07.2003 |
Change - representative |
published on 27.08.2003 [2003/35] |
21.03.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
21.03.2003 |
First examination report |
|
09.08.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.12.2001 |
Change - extension states |
|
17.08.2001 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 04.10.2001 [2001/40] |
13.04.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 30.05.2001 [2001/22] |
01.12.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.01.2001 [2001/03] |