Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1069376 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2005 | B1 | EP1069376 | 17.01.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI991575 | 15.07.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE289040T | 15.02.2005 | T1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI991575 | 15.07.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60017989D1 | 17.03.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI991575 | 15.07.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT1313176 | 17.06.2002 | B1 | ITMI991575 | 15.01.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI991575 | 15.07.1999 |