EP1174453 - Process for preparing a flexible polyurethane foam [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2002 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUNTSMAN INTERNATIONAL LLC 500 Huntsman Way Salt Lake City, Utah 84108 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/04] | For all designated states HUNTSMAN INTERNATIONAL LLC 500 Huntsman Way Salt Lake City, Utah 84108 / US | Representative(s) | Baken, Philippus Johannes L. H. Huntsman (Europe) BVBA Intellectual Property Department Everslaan 45 3078 Everberg / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Baken, Philippus Johannes L. H. Huntsman (Europe) BVBA Intellectual Property Department Everslaan 45 3078 Everberg / BE | ||
Former [2002/04] | Baken, Philippus Johannes Leonardus Henricus HUNTSMAN ICI (EUROPE) BVBA, Huntsman Polyurethanes, Intellectual Property Department, Everslaan 45 3078 Everberg / BE | Application number, filing date | 00115407.9 | 17.07.2000 | [2002/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1174453 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/48, C08G18/76 | [2002/04] | CPC: |
C08G18/7671 (EP,US);
C08G18/4837 (EP,US);
C08G2110/0008 (EP,US);
C08G2110/005 (EP,US);
C08G2110/0083 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines flexiblen Polyurethanschaumes | [2002/04] | English: | Process for preparing a flexible polyurethane foam | [2002/04] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'une mousse de polyuréthane flexible | [2002/04] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/26] | 17.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: A.91(5) [2002/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5521226 (BLEYS GEERT [BE]) [A] 1-4 * column 1, line 25 - column 3, line 23 * * example 8; table 3 *; | [A]US5369138 (GANSEN PETER [DE]) [A] 1-4 * column 2, line 15 - line 52 * * example 3 *; | [A]US5677361 (TREBOUX JEAN-PAUL RENE [FR], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 8 - column 10; example 1; table I * |