EP1092582 - Method for controlling a transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.12.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WABCO GmbH & Co. OHG Am Lindener Hafen 21 30453 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/16] | For all designated states WABCO GmbH & Co. OHG Am Lindener Hafen 21 30453 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Böckmann, Gerhard Tilsiter Strasse 1c 30880 Laatzen / DE | 02 /
Böhm, Andreas Bergstrasse 10 30974 Wennigsen / DE | [2001/16] | Representative(s) | Schrödter, Manfred WABCO GmbH Postfach 91 12 62 30432 Hannover / DE | [2009/40] |
Former [2001/16] | Schrödter, Manfred WABCO GmbH & Co. OHG, Am Lindener Hafen 21 30453 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 00115513.4 | 19.07.2000 | [2001/16] | Priority number, date | DE1999148992 | 12.10.1999 Original published format: DE 19948992 | [2001/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1092582 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1092582 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | [2002/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60K41/04 | [2001/16] | CPC: |
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/11 (EP,US);
B60W30/18 (EP,US);
B60W50/0097 (EP);
F01L13/06 (EP,US);
F16H61/0403 (EP,US);
B60W2050/0042 (EP);
B60W2510/1005 (EP,US);
B60W2510/1015 (EP,US);
B60W2510/102 (EP,US);
B60W2510/104 (EP,US);
B60W2520/105 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT, SE [2003/21] |
Former [2001/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung eines Getriebes | [2001/16] | English: | Method for controlling a transmission | [2001/16] | French: | Procédure de commande d'un transmission | [2001/16] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/19] | 23.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4446120 (SCANIA CV AB [SE]) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * column 8, line 6 - line 50 *; | [X]EP0925990 (EATON CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,9 * abstract * * column 6, line 34 - column 7, line 4 *; | [PX]EP1013973 (EATON CORP [US]) [PX] 1-4 * abstract * * column 9, line 28 - line 47 *; | [AD]EP0670440 (EATON CORP [US]) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0641958 (EATON CORP [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]FR2431642 (BERLIET AUTOMOBILES [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0670440 |