Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] |
13.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.01.2003 [2003/05] |
27.08.2002 | Change - extension states | |
06.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
05.07.2002 | Surcharge for renewal fee | |
13.05.2002 | Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) | |
13.05.2002 | Period of grace (R.85b EPC1973) | |
26.04.2002 | Definitive list of designations | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] |
10.08.2001 | Publication of search report | published on 26.09.2001 [2001/39] |
10.05.2001 | Renewal fee | |
08.09.2000 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 25.10.2000 [2000/43] |