Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0019908 | Global Dossier | 13.04.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16580898 | 02.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH11332493 | Global Dossier | 07.12.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US23711799 | 26.01.1999 | US8414098 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002526145 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US16580898 | 02.10.1998 | IB9901540 | 13.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000107028 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US16508098 | 02.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1117333 | Global Dossier | 25.07.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16580898 | 02.10.1998 | IB9901540 | 13.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0990597 | Global Dossier | 15.09.2004 | B1 | EP0990597 | 05.04.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16508098 | 02.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0960570 | Global Dossier | 11.02.2004 | B1 | EP0960570 | 27.09.2000 | A3 | EP0960570 | 01.12.1999 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US23711799 | 26.01.1999 | US8414098 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0954985 | Global Dossier | 04.02.2004 | B1 | EP0954985 | 09.08.2000 | A3 | EP0954985 | 10.11.1999 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US7471498 | 08.05.1998 | US20027498 | 24.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU754912B | Global Dossier | 28.11.2002 | B2 | AU2699499 | 06.04.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US16508098 | 02.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1046346 | Global Dossier | 26.09.2001 | A3 | EP1046346 | 25.10.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US16508098 | 02.10.1998 | US7471498 | 08.05.1998 | US20027498 | 24.11.1998 | US21501298 | 17.12.1998 | US8414098 | 26.05.1998 | EP99108580 | 06.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR015081 | 11.04.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US23711799 | 26.01.1999 | US8414098 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE258755T | 15.02.2004 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US7471498 | 08.05.1998 | US20027498 | 24.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE259156T | 15.02.2004 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US23711799 | 26.01.1999 | US8414098 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE276165T | 15.10.2004 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US16508098 | 02.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9901984 | 16.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US23711799 | 26.01.1999 | US8414098 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2271334 | 01.10.2002 | C | CA2271334 | 02.04.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16508098 | 02.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2271355 | 08.11.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7471498 | 08.05.1998 | US20027498 | 24.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2271364 | 26.11.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US23711799 | 26.01.1999 | US8414098 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2340233 | 13.04.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16580898 | 02.10.1998 | IB9901540 | 13.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1283176C | 08.11.2006 | C | CN1236565 | 01.12.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US23711799 | 26.01.1999 | US8414098 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1238141 | 15.12.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US7471498 | 08.05.1998 | US20027498 | 24.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ160099 | 15.12.1999 | A3 | Priority number | Date | US7471498 | 08.05.1998 | US20027498 | 24.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69914525T | 23.12.2004 | T2 | DE69914525D1 | 11.03.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US7471498 | 08.05.1998 | US20027498 | 24.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69914665T | 08.07.2004 | T2 | DE69914665D1 | 18.03.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US23711799 | 26.01.1999 | US8414098 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69920128T | 20.01.2005 | T2 | DE69920128D1 | 21.10.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US16508098 | 02.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1023916 | 29.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US23711799 | 26.01.1999 | US8414098 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ID26717A | 01.02.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US23711799 | 26.01.1999 | US8414098 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL129841 | 01.12.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US16508098 | 02.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20000028569 | 25.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US16508098 | 02.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MA25186 | 02.07.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7471498 | 08.05.1998 | US20027498 | 24.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO992238L | 09.11.1999 | L | NO992238D0 | 07.05.1999 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US7471498 | 08.05.1998 | US20027498 | 24.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO992239L | 29.11.1999 | L | NO992239D0 | 07.05.1999 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US23711799 | 26.01.1999 | US8414098 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ335590 | 29.09.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US16508098 | 02.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL188753B | 29.04.2005 | B1 | PL333002 | 10.04.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16508098 | 02.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL192038B | 31.08.2006 | B1 | PL332992 | 06.12.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US23711799 | 26.01.1999 | US8414098 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL332993 | 22.11.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7471498 | 08.05.1998 | US20027498 | 24.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG72951 | 23.05.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16508098 | 02.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG75952 | 24.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7471498 | 08.05.1998 | US20027498 | 24.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR199900986 | 21.12.1999 | A3 | TR199900986 | 21.12.1999 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US7471498 | 08.05.1998 | US20027498 | 24.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR199901156 | 21.12.1999 | A3 | TR199901156 | 21.12.1999 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US23711799 | 26.01.1999 | US8414098 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW457213B | 01.10.2001 | B | Priority number | Date | US16508098 | 02.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6146682 | 14.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US23711799 | 26.01.1999 | US8414098 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6168564 | 02.01.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US16580898 | 02.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6175105 | 16.01.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US16508098 | 02.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6514547 | 04.02.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US7471498 | 08.05.1998 | US20027498 | 24.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA993148 | 05.11.1999 | B | Priority number | Date | US8414098 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA993149 | 05.11.1999 | B | Priority number | Date | US7471498 | 08.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA993150 | 05.11.1999 | B | Priority number | Date | US16508098 | 02.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA993151 | 05.11.1999 | B | Priority number | Date | US7471498 | 08.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH11346692 | Global Dossier | 21.12.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US16508098 | 02.10.1998 | US7471498 | 08.05.1998 | US20027498 | 24.11.1998 | US21501298 | 17.12.1998 | US8414098 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0954981 | Global Dossier | 28.01.2004 | B1 | EP0954981 | 23.08.2000 | A3 | EP0954981 | 10.11.1999 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US16508098 | 02.10.1998 | US7471498 | 08.05.1998 | US20027498 | 24.11.1998 | US21501298 | 17.12.1998 | US8414098 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2699699 | Global Dossier | 18.11.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US7471498 | 08.05.1998 | US16580898 | 02.10.1998 | US20027498 | 24.11.1998 | US21501298 | 17.12.1998 | US8414098 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR013039 | 22.11.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16508098 | 02.10.1998 | US7471498 | 08.05.1998 | US20027498 | 24.11.1998 | US21501298 | 17.12.1998 | US8414098 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE258385T | 15.02.2004 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US16508098 | 02.10.1998 | US7471498 | 08.05.1998 | US20027498 | 24.11.1998 | US21501298 | 17.12.1998 | US8414098 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9901987 | 16.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US16508098 | 02.10.1998 | US7471498 | 08.05.1998 | US20027498 | 24.11.1998 | US21501298 | 17.12.1998 | US8414098 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2271360 | 08.11.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16508098 | 02.10.1998 | US7471498 | 08.05.1998 | US20027498 | 24.11.1998 | US21501298 | 17.12.1998 | US8414098 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CO5060507 | 30.07.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16508098 | 02.10.1998 | US7471498 | 08.05.1998 | US20027498 | 24.11.1998 | US21501298 | 17.12.1998 | US8414098 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69914400T | 01.07.2004 | T2 | DE69914400D1 | 04.03.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US16508098 | 02.10.1998 | US7471498 | 08.05.1998 | US20027498 | 24.11.1998 | US21501298 | 17.12.1998 | US8414098 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL129798 | 26.08.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US16508098 | 02.10.1998 | US7471498 | 08.05.1998 | US20027498 | 24.11.1998 | US21501298 | 17.12.1998 | US8414098 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR19990088127 | 27.12.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US16508098 | 02.10.1998 | US7471498 | 08.05.1998 | US20027498 | 24.11.1998 | US21501298 | 17.12.1998 | US8414098 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO992240L | 09.11.1999 | L | NO992240D0 | 07.05.1999 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US16508098 | 02.10.1998 | US7471498 | 08.05.1998 | US20027498 | 24.11.1998 | US21501298 | 17.12.1998 | US8414098 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ335616 | 28.01.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US16508098 | 02.10.1998 | US7471498 | 08.05.1998 | US20027498 | 24.11.1998 | US21501298 | 17.12.1998 | US8414098 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL333003 | 22.11.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16508098 | 02.10.1998 | US7471498 | 08.05.1998 | US20027498 | 24.11.1998 | US21501298 | 17.12.1998 | US8414098 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG73638 | 20.06.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16508098 | 02.10.1998 | US7471498 | 08.05.1998 | US20027498 | 24.11.1998 | US21501298 | 17.12.1998 | US8414098 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6217918 | 17.04.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US16508098 | 02.10.1998 | US7471498 | 08.05.1998 | US20027498 | 24.11.1998 | US21501298 | 17.12.1998 | US8414098 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Earlier application | EP0954981 |