EP1046346 - Microwavable pasta in a bowl [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bestfoods International Plaza, 700 Sylvan Avenue Englewood Cliffs, NJ 07632 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/43] | For all designated states Bestfoods International Plaza, 700 Sylvan Avenue Englewood Cliffs, NJ 07632 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rubbright, Harry A. 1040 Avanti Drive Mendota Heights, MN 55118 / US | 02 /
Beall, Nelson J. 17 Front Street, N.W. St. Michael, MN 55376 / US | 03 /
Gaeta, Stephen A. 21 De Hoff Drive Flemington, NJ 08822 / US | 04 /
Meiners, Mary Deborah 53 Taurus Drive Sommerville, NJ 08876 / US | 05 /
Oh, Nam H. 11 North Ridgeway Warren, NJ 07059 / US | 06 /
Tecedor, Silverio Luiz 7 Bloomfield Harrington Park, NJ 07640 / US | 07 /
Schryer, Richard F. 20 Pleasant Road High Bridge, NJ 08829 / US | 08 /
Meyers, Edward J. 164 East Clay Avenue Roselle Park, NJ 07204 / US | 09 /
Hefnawy, Magdy M. 18 East Logan Road Randolph, NJ 07869 / US | [2000/43] | Representative(s) | Lederer, Franz, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Lederer, Franz, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/43] | Lederer, Franz, Dr., et al Lederer, Keller & Riederer Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00115662.9 | 06.05.1999 | [2000/43] | Priority number, date | US19980215012 | 17.12.1998 Original published format: US 215012 | US19980074714 | 08.05.1998 Original published format: US 74714 | US19980084140 | 26.05.1998 Original published format: US 84140 | US19980165080 | 02.10.1998 Original published format: US 165080 | US19980200274 | 24.11.1998 Original published format: US 200274 | [2000/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1046346 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1046346 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | [2001/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/16, B65D81/34, A23L1/40, A23P1/04 | [2000/43] | CPC: |
A23L23/10 (EP);
A23L7/109 (EP);
B65D2581/3404 (EP);
B65D2581/3456 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Mikrowellenerhitzbare Teigware in einer Schale | [2000/43] | English: | Microwavable pasta in a bowl | [2000/43] | French: | Pâtes alimentaires dans un bol pour cuisson au micro-onde | [2000/43] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/05] | 13.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/05] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99108580.4 / EP0954981 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.05.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.05.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9505751 (SCHERER CORP R P [US], et al) [A] 1-11,14,15 * example - *; | [A]JPH09299052 ; | [A]EP0824000 (NESTLE SA [CH]) [A] 4,10,11 * example - *; | [A]US3987207 (SPAETI MAX, et al) [A] 1,4,7-11 * example - *; | [A]US5077066 (MATTSON PETER H [US], et al) [A] 1,12 * column 2, line 52 - column 4, line 37 *; | [A]US4797288 (SHARMA SHRI C [US], et al) [A] 1,8 * column 6, line 55 - column 8, line 9 *; | [A]GB1254562 (SPICE & FLAVOUR SERVICES LTD) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [PA]WO9902044 (NESTLE SA [CH], et al) [PA] 1-15 * abstract *; | [PA]EP0872188 (FAVERO ANTONIO S R L [IT]) [PA] 1-15 * claim - * | [A] - KOBAYASHI, TOSHIO, "Thawing container of frozen pasta and thawing", DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 98, no. 06, Database accession no. 1998-056529[06], XP002141356 & JPH09299052 A 19971125 (KOBAYASHI H) [A] 1,4,7,16 * abstract * |