EP1072558 - Ultraviolet liquid treatment apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.2004 [2004/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Photoscience Japan Corporation 5-8-3, Sando-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/05] | For all designated states Photoscience Japan Corporation 5-8-3, Sando-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakano, Koji, c/o Photoscience Japan Corporation 5-8-3, Sanda-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Yamakoshi, Yuji, c/o Photoscience Japan Corp. 5-8-3, Sanda-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | [2001/05] | Representative(s) | Kehl, Günther Kehl, Ascherl, Liebhoff & Ettmayr Patentanwälte Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/05] | Kehl, Günther, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwaltskanzlei Günther Kehl Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00115755.1 | 21.07.2000 | [2001/05] | Priority number, date | JP19990211271 | 26.07.1999 Original published format: JP 21127199 | [2001/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1072558 | Date: | 31.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/32 | [2001/05] | CPC: |
A61L2/10 (EP,KR);
C02F1/325 (EP);
C02F2201/3223 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2001/42] |
Former [2001/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Behandlung von Flüssigkeiten mit UV-Strahlung | [2001/05] | English: | Ultraviolet liquid treatment apparatus | [2001/05] | French: | Dispositif de traitement de liquide par rayonnement ultraviolet | [2001/05] | Examination procedure | 21.07.2000 | Examination requested [2001/05] | 30.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/25] | 14.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9910282 (HANSA METALLWERKE AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,3 * figures 1,2; claims 1-6 * [A] 2,4-6; | [XA]US5853676 (MORGAN JR W WAYNE [CA]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-6; | [XA]US5019256 (IFILL LEE [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 6, lines 53-64; figure 3 * [A] 2-6; | [A]US5412549 (BLAKELY MARK K [US]) [A] 1-6 * column 3, lines 3-10; figures 4,6 * |