EP1174568 - Hydraulic crusher [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.2003 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Klemm, Günter, Prof. Dr.-Ing. Gray 21 9572 Deutsch-Griffen / AT | [2002/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/04] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/04] | Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 00115805.4 | 22.07.2000 | [2002/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1174568 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1174568 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E04G23/08 | [2002/04] | CPC: |
E02F3/965 (EP,US);
E04G23/08 (EP,US);
E04G23/082 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/04] | Title | German: | Hydraulische Abbruchzange | [2002/04] | English: | Hydraulic crusher | [2002/04] | French: | Pince de démolition hydraulique | [2002/04] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 01.12.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2000 | Examination requested [2002/04] | 23.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.02.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 28.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 27.03.2002 | FR | 27.03.2002 | GB | 27.03.2002 | GR | 27.03.2002 | IE | 27.03.2002 | IT | 27.03.2002 | NL | 27.03.2002 | DK | 27.06.2002 | PT | 27.06.2002 | SE | 27.06.2002 | AT | 22.07.2002 | LU | 22.07.2002 | BE | 31.07.2002 | CY | 31.07.2002 | ES | 25.09.2002 | [2007/35] |
Former [2006/14] | FI | 27.03.2002 | |
FR | 27.03.2002 | ||
GB | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
IE | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
DK | 27.06.2002 | ||
PT | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
AT | 22.07.2002 | ||
LU | 22.07.2002 | ||
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
CY | 31.07.2002 | ||
ES | 25.09.2002 | ||
Former [2004/39] | FI | 27.03.2002 | |
GB | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
IE | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
DK | 27.06.2002 | ||
PT | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
AT | 22.07.2002 | ||
LU | 22.07.2002 | ||
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
CY | 31.07.2002 | ||
ES | 25.09.2002 | ||
Former [2004/10] | FI | 27.03.2002 | |
GB | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
IE | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
DK | 27.06.2002 | ||
PT | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
AT | 22.07.2002 | ||
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
CY | 31.07.2002 | ||
ES | 25.09.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | FI | 27.03.2002 | |
GB | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
IE | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
DK | 27.06.2002 | ||
PT | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
AT | 22.07.2002 | ||
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
ES | 25.09.2002 | ||
Former [2004/03] | FI | 27.03.2002 | |
GB | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
IE | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
DK | 27.06.2002 | ||
PT | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
AT | 22.07.2002 | ||
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/51] | FI | 27.03.2002 | |
GB | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
IE | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
DK | 27.06.2002 | ||
PT | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/45] | FI | 27.03.2002 | |
GB | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
IE | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
DK | 27.06.2002 | ||
PT | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | FI | 27.03.2002 | |
GB | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
IE | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
PT | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/19] | FI | 27.03.2002 | |
GB | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
IE | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | FI | 27.03.2002 | |
GB | 27.03.2002 | ||
IE | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/07] | FI | 27.03.2002 | |
GB | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | FI | 27.03.2002 | |
GB | 27.03.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | FI | 27.03.2002 | |
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2002/37] | SE | 27.06.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH08254021 ; | [X]JPH10259670 ; | [XA]WO9635034 (HAWKINS PETER A T [GB]) [X] 1,2,7 * page 11, paragraph 3 - page 14; figure -; claim - * [A] 2,4,6,8-10 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 02, & JP08254021 A 19961001 (SAKURAI KAZUYUKI) [X] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981231), vol. 1998, no. 14, & JP10259670 A 19980929 (SHIN CATERPILLAR MITSUBISHI LTD) [X] 1,2,7 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0486871 |