EP1176389 - Method and device for optical range or speed measurement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leica Geosystems AG Heinrich-Wild-Strasse 9435 Heerbrugg / CH | [2002/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ehbets, Hartmut Bueriswilen 9442 Berneck / CH | [2002/05] | Representative(s) | Kaminski, Susanne, et al Kaminski Harmann Patentanwälte AG Landstrasse 124 9490 Vaduz / LI | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Kaminski, Susanne, et al Büchel, Kaminski & Partner Patentanwälte Est. Austrasse 79 9490 Vaduz / LI | ||
Former [2002/29] | Kaminski, Susanne, et al Büchel, Kaminski & Partner Austrasse 79 9490 Vaduz / LI | ||
Former [2002/05] | Kaminski, Susanne, Dr. Büchel, Kaminski & Partner Patentanwälte Est., Letzanaweg 25-27 9495 Triesen / LI | Application number, filing date | 00115838.5 | 24.07.2000 | [2002/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1176389 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01C15/00, G01P3/68, H01S3/06, G01C1/02 | [2002/05] | CPC: |
G01P3/68 (EP,US);
G01C1/02 (EP,US);
G01C15/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/42] |
Former [2002/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur optischen Distanz- oder Geschwindigkeitsmessung | [2002/05] | English: | Method and device for optical range or speed measurement | [2002/05] | French: | Méthode et dispositif de mesure optique de distance ou de vitesse | [2002/05] | Examination procedure | 05.05.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.05.2001 | Examination requested [2002/05] | 31.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/16] | 15.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: designation fee not paid in time [2003/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.09.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH03276004 ; | [Y]US5521696 (DUNNE JEREMY G [US]) [Y] 19 * abstract *; | [Y]US6048105 (OHTOMO FUMIO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-9,12-14 * column 1, line 19 - line 24 * * column 1, line 44 - line 47 * * column 2, line 24 - line 32 ** column 3, line 16 - line 26 *; | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920310), vol. 016, no. 096, Database accession no. (P - 1322), & JP03276004 A 19911206 (OMRON CORP) [X] 1-4,8,9 * abstract * [Y] 19 | [Y] - GORT A F, "A fully integrated, microprocessor-controlled total station", HEWLETT-PACKARD JOURNAL, SEPT. 1980, USA, vol. 31, no. 9, ISSN 0018-1153, pages 3 - 11, XP002155352 [Y] 1-9,12-14 * the whole document * |