EP1072559 - Device for wastewater purification [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.08.2003 [2003/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INGERLE, Kurt Technikerstrasse 13 A-6020 Innsbruck / AT | [2001/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/05] | Representative(s) | Hofinger, Engelbert, et al Patentanwälte Torggler & Hofinger Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/05] | Hofinger, Engelbert, Dr.Dr., et al Patentanwälte Torggler & Hofinger Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | Application number, filing date | 00115996.1 | 26.07.2000 | [2001/05] | Priority number, date | AT19990001291 | 26.07.1999 Original published format: AT 129199 | [2001/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1072559 | Date: | 31.01.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1072559 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | [2002/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/12, C02F3/30 | [2002/11] | CPC: |
C02F3/1263 (EP);
Y02W10/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/05] | C02F3/12 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/01] |
Former [2001/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Reinigung von Abwasser | [2001/05] | English: | Device for wastewater purification | [2001/05] | French: | Dispositif pour la purification de l'eau usée | [2001/05] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/33] | 13.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.11.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.11.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9700832 (BISASCO PTY LIMITED [AU], et al) [X] 1,5-10 * page 3, line 3 - line 33 * * page 9, line 22 - page 11, line 4 * * figure 1 *; | [X]AU560510B (CENEPRINT PTY LTD) [X] 1,5 * page 2A, line 1 - page 2B, line 13 * * page 4, lines 19-25 * * page 6, line 30 - page 8, line 30 * * figures 1,3,4 *; | [A]WO9708104 (INGERLE KURT [AT]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US5395527 (DESJARDINS GAETAN [CA]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [X] - TEICHGRÄBER BURKHARD, "Belebungsanlagen mit Aufstaubetrieb. Bemessung und Anwendung.", KORRESPONDENZ ABWASSER, Hennef (DE), (1998), vol. 45, no. 5, pages 886 - 900, XP002187782 [X] 1-4 * page 888, column R, line 1 - page 892, column R, line 33 * * figures 3,4 * |