EP1081988 - Circuit for operating at least one discharge lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Köppl, Richard Stalberstrasse 14A 83416 Saaldorf / DE | 02 /
Busse, Olaf Schochenbergstrasse 24 80686 München / DE | 03 /
Grabner, Martin Von-Haller-Strasse 4 80999 München / DE | [2001/10] | Application number, filing date | 00116153.8 | 01.08.2000 | [2001/10] | Priority number, date | DE1999141437 | 30.08.1999 Original published format: DE 19941437 | [2001/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1081988 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1081988 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | [2002/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1081988 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/298 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
H05B41/2985 (EP,US);
Y10S315/02 (EP,US);
Y10S315/05 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/10] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zum Betrieb mindestens einer Entladungslampe | [2001/10] | English: | Circuit for operating at least one discharge lamp | [2001/10] | French: | Circuit pour alimenter au moins une lampe à décharge | [2001/10] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/03] | 14.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 27.10.2004 | IE | 27.10.2004 | DK | 27.01.2005 | GR | 27.01.2005 | ES | 07.02.2005 | PT | 27.03.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2005/46] | FI | 27.10.2004 | |
IE | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
ES | 07.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | FI | 27.10.2004 | |
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
ES | 07.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 27.10.2004 | |
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 27.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9743879 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 8, line 33 - page 9, line 16 ** page 13, line 3 - page 14, line 27; figure 6 *; | [X]EP0886460 (HELVAR OY [FI]) [X] 1-7 * column 4, line 17 - column 4, line 35 * * column 5, line 4 - column 5, line 25; figures 4,6,7 * |