EP1074511 - Process for the preparation of nitrogen dioxide from nitrogen monoxide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2004/08] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2001/06] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kiefer, Matthias, Dr. Gutenbergstrasse 5 69226 Nussloch / DE | 02 /
Bohner, Gerd Im Klipfel 18 69254 Malsch / DE | 03 /
Stegmaier, Wolfgang, Dr. Lincolnstrasse 18 67434 Neustadt / DE | 04 /
Garbe, Gunter Am Heidegericht 5 67688 Rodenbach / DE | [2001/06] | Representative(s) | Isenbruck, Günter, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/06] | Isenbruck, Günter, Dr., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Bardehle-Pagenberg-Dost-Altenburg-Geissler-Isenbruck Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 00116234.6 | 07.08.2000 | [2001/06] | Priority number, date | DE19991036841 | 05.08.1999 Original published format: DE 19936841 | [2001/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1074511 | Date: | 07.02.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1074511 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | [2001/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1074511 | Date: | 18.02.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C01B21/36 | [2001/06] | CPC: |
C01B21/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [2002/01] |
Former [2001/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Stickstoffdioxid aus Stickstoffmonoxid | [2001/06] | English: | Process for the preparation of nitrogen dioxide from nitrogen monoxide | [2001/06] | French: | Procédé pour la production de peroxyde d'azote à partir d'oxyde azotique | [2001/06] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/48] | 21.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH02307815 ; | [DA]US3393047 (IB STEINMETZ-SCHMALTZ) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US3101255 (CARR DUGALD M, et al) [A] 1-10 * page 2, column 1, line 5 - line 29; claim 1 *; | [A]US5264198 (GRZYLL LAWRENCE R [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 2, column 1, line 30 - line 68 *; | [A]DE1200793 (MCKEE & CO ARTHUR G) [A] 1-10 * claim 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910307), vol. 015, no. 096, Database accession no. (C - 0812), & JP02307815 A 19901221 (UBE IND LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |